Van Le v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nhung Van Le
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., AFNI, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Credit One Bank, National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc., First Premier Bank, Credit First National Association and Netcredit Loan Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01809
Filed: September 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Credit One Bank.(Mohandesi, Behzad) (aef)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT re #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the deadline for defendant CREDIT FIRST NATIONAL ASSOCIATION to respond to the Complaint in this case shall be extended to November 21, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/30/2019. (sjm)
October 29, 2019 Filing 40 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Credit First National Association. (Larson, Arnold)Attorney Arnold D Larson added to party Credit First National Association(pty:dft) (sjm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by AFNI, Inc. (Zugsay, Kathleen) (sjm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 38 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AFNI, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Zugsay, Kathleen) (sjm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by National Credit Adjusters, LLC (Zugsay, Kathleen) (sjm).
October 29, 2019 Filing 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Credit Adjusters, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Zugsay, Kathleen) (sjm).
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default by LVNV Funding, LLC. (Mohandesi, Behzad) (aef).
October 28, 2019 Filing 34 Joint MOTION to Set Aside Default by LVNV Funding, LLC. (Mohandesi, Behzad)Attorney Behzad Ben Mohandesi added to party LVNV Funding, LLC(pty:dft) Modified on 10/29/2019 QC email sent re proposed orders should not be filed; motion termed (aef).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #32 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant First Premier Bank to Respond to Complaint. The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion. First Premier shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/24/2019. (aef)
October 23, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by First Premier Bank. (Taylor, Tanya)Attorney Tanya M. Taylor added to party First Premier Bank(pty:dft) (aef).
October 22, 2019 Filing 31 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to LVNV Funding, LLC. (aef)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting #29 Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint. The Court hereby ORDERS that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended from October 21, 2019 to November 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/21/2019. (aef)
October 21, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Credit One Bank. (Mohandesi, Behzad)Attorney Behzad Ben Mohandesi added to party Credit One Bank(pty:dft) (aef).
October 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Credit One Bank . Identifying Corporate Parent Credit One Financial for Credit One Bank. (Mohandesi, Behzad) (aef).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER on #23 Joint Motion to Extend National Credit Adjusters, LLC's Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' Motion is GRANTED. Defendant National Credit Adjusters, LLC, shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/21/2019. (aef)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER on Joint Motion to Extend Afni Inc.'s Deadline to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. (ECF #16 ) It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties' Motion is GRANTED. Defendant Afni, Inc., shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint no later than November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/18/2019. (aef)
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC identifying Corporate Parent PRA Group, Inc. for Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.. (Yu, Leanne) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.(Yu, Leanne)Attorney Leanne Yu added to party Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by National Credit Adjusters, LLC. (Zugsay, Kathleen)Attorney Kathleen Zugsay added to party National Credit Adjusters, LLC(pty:dft) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 22 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against LVNV Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Matthew) (rmc).
October 18, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Fox added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. re #18 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Lopez, Randy) Modified on 10/22/2019 to add Corporate Parent Macy's, Inc.; Other Affiliate FDS Thrift Holding Co., Inc.; Other Affiliate FDS Bank, as identified in Notice (rmc).
October 18, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Macys Retail Holdings, Inc for Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. (Lopez, Randy) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc..(Lopez, Randy)Attorney Randy Alberto Lopez added to party Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by AFNI, Inc.. (Zugsay, Kathleen)Attorney Kathleen Zugsay added to party AFNI, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant NetCredit Loan Services, LLC to Respond to Complaint. The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion. Accordingly, NetCredit shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before November 18, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/16/2019. (aef)
October 16, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Netcredit Loan Services, LLC. (Taylor, Tanya)Attorney Tanya M. Taylor added to party Netcredit Loan Services, LLC(pty:dft)(aef).
October 15, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le, as to Trans Union, LLC. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. Credit First National Association served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. AFNI, Inc. served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. Netcredit Loan Services, LLC served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. First Premier Bank served. (Hartman, Jared) (ag).
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. Credit One Bank served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. National Credit Adjusters, LLC served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc. served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
September 28, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nhung Van Le. LVNV Funding, LLC served. (Hartman, Jared) (aef).
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AFNI, Inc., Credit First National Association, Credit One Bank, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., First Premier Bank, LVNV Funding, LLC, Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc., National Credit Adjusters, LLC, Netcredit Loan Services, LLC, Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12963224), filed by Nhung Van Le. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01809-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hartman, Jared)(jmo)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Le v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: Behzad Ben Mohandesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew R. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFNI, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Zugsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC
Represented By: Leanne Yu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit One Bank
Represented By: Behzad Ben Mohandesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Credit Adjusters, LLC
Represented By: Kathleen Zugsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macy's Credit and Customer Services, Inc.
Represented By: Randy Alberto Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Represented By: Tanya M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit First National Association
Represented By: Arnold D Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Netcredit Loan Services, LLC
Represented By: Tanya M. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhung Van Le
Represented By: Jared M. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?