Evanston Insurance Company v. Liquidagents Healthcare LLC et al
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Defendant: Jae Kang, Helena Kang, Nancy Wille and Liquidagents Healthcare LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv01860
Filed: September 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Evanston Insurance Company (Economou, Cary) (jrm).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #6 Notice of Errata, from Plaintiff Evanston Insurance Company. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Erratas not permitted. Civil Local Rule 15.1.a Amended Pleadings. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge the Chambers of Anthony J. Battaglia.(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/2/2019: #1 Stricken Document 6) (jrm).
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 **Document Stricken per Order #7 ** NOTICE OF ERRATA REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT TO INCORPORATE EXHIBIT A by Evanston Insurance Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Economou, Cary) . Modified to strike on 10/2/2019 (jrm).
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1860-AJB-MSB.(no document attached) (mme)
September 30, 2019 Filing 4 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
September 30, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Evanston Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company. (jxv)
September 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Helena Kang, Jae Kang, Liquidagents Healthcare LLC, Nancy Wille ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13001743.), filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01860-BEN-MSB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Economou, Cary)(jxv) (sjt). Modified on 9/30/2019(jxv).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evanston Insurance Company v. Liquidagents Healthcare LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jae Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helena Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liquidagents Healthcare LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Cary Joy Economou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?