National City Puppy, LLC v. City of National City et al
Plaintiff: National City Puppy, LLC
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, City of National City and Angil Morris-Jones
Case Number: 3:2019cv01942
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF REMAND. Because the Court cannot reach the merits of the case, allpending motions are denied without prejudice and all pending dates or deadlines are vacated. This action is remanded to the Superior Court of California for the County of San Diego. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/25/2019. (Certified copy sent via U.S. Mail Service to Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case No. 37-02019-00049045-CU-CR-CTL) (jdt) (sjt).
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by City of National City re #3 Order to Show Cause,. (Mitchell, Carrie) (jdt).
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by National City Puppy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration with exhibits)(Najjar, George). Modified on 10/25/2019 to remove duplicative text (jdt).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Extending Time for Defendants to Answer. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/23/2019. (jdt)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 ***DOCKETED IN ERROR*** Modified on 10/24/2019 to remove image and docket text. NEF regenerated (jdt).
October 19, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Response to Complaint filed by National City Puppy, LLC. (Najjar, George) (mme).
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Notice of Removal, Response to Complaint by City of National City, Angil Morris-Jones. (Mitchell, Carrie) (jdt).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Re: Jurisdiction. Defendant is ordered to show cause why this action should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Order to Show Cause Brief due by 10/25/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/11/2019. (jdt)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19-cv-01942-LAB-BGS.(no document attached) (sxa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00049045-CU-CR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13029999.), filed by City of National City, Angil Morris-Jones, Does 1 through 25. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01942-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: National City Puppy, LLC v. City of National City et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of National City
Represented By: Carrie L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angil Morris-Jones
Represented By: Carrie L Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National City Puppy, LLC
Represented By: George Richard Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?