Mosier v. Quality Loan Service Corporation et al
Plaintiff: David Mosier
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation, Washington Mutual Bank, FA, Property Investment, LLC and Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2019cv01956
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED: This action is dismissed without prejudice but without leave to amend.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend; and ORDER of Dismissal Without Leave to Amend. This action is dismissed without prejudice but without leave to amend. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/5/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #1 Complaint, by David Mosier. (jdt) (Main Document 5 replaced on 11/5/2019) (jdt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jdt).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failing to invoke the Court's jurisdiction. No later than the close of business on 11/4/2019, Mosier may file an amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/11/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt) (sjt).
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (sxa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by David Mosier re #1 Complaint. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sxa)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Property Investment, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Washington Mutual Bank, FA, Does 1-25 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS116049.), filed by David Mosier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01956-LAB-LL. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Mosier, David)(sxa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosier v. Quality Loan Service Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Mosier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Mutual Bank, FA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Property Investment, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?