Rodriguez v. Upstart Network, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gloria Rodriguez
Defendant: Upstart Network, Inc., LendingPoint, LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC and Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Case Number: 3:2019cv01971
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #17 Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines pending Dismissal. The Court GRANTS the Joint Motion. All pending deadlines are VACATED, this Action is STAYED, and the parties SHALL FILE dismissal papers or a joint status report within forty-five (45) days of the electronic docketing of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/14/2020. (aef)
February 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Motion to Stay All Deadlines Pending Dismissal by LendingPoint, LLC, Upstart Network, Inc. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Fitz-Patrick, Kay) (aef).
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Goldman Sachs Bank USA, Only, without Prejudice. Each party to bear their own attorneys fees and costs.Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/24/20.(jmo) (dsn)
January 24, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gloria Rodriguez , as to Goldman Sachs Bank USA, only, without prejudice (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Only, without Prejudice. This Court hereby orders Defendant Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, only, to be, and is, dismissed without prejudice. Each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/16/2020. (aef)
January 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gloria Rodriguez , as to Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, only (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (aef).
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Joint Motion and Stipulation for Order to Continue Deadline to Respond to the First Amended Complaint. Defendants Upstart Network, Inc. and LendingPoint, LLC's deadline to file a response to the First Amended Complaint is hereby extended up to and including February 18, 2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 1/7/2020. (aef)
January 7, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, by LendingPoint, LLC, Upstart Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order)(Fitz-Patrick, Kay)Attorney Kay Fitz-Patrick added to party LendingPoint, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kay Fitz-Patrick added to party Upstart Network, Inc.(pty:dft) (aef).
January 3, 2020 Filing 10 Amended Summons Issued as to First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs Bank USA, LendingPoint, LLC, Upstart Network, Inc., filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)New Summons Requested. (Hart, Yana)(aef).
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Gloria Rodriguez re #7 Amended Complaint, filed by Gloria Rodriguez . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (mme).
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 **WITHDRAWN PER ECF #8**FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, LendingPoint, LLC, Upstart Network, Inc., Goldman Sachs Bank USA, filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) New Summons Requested. (Hart, Yana) (aef). Modified on 1/3/2020 to reflect FAC withdrawn (mme).
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gloria Rodriguez, as to Upstart Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (mme).
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gloria Rodriguez, as to LendingPoint, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (mme).
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1971-DMS-KSC.(no document attached) (mme)
October 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Gloria Rodriguez (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Gloria Rodriguez(pty:pla) (mme).
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa) (jao).
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, LendingPoint, LLC, Upstart Network, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13048453.), filed by Gloria Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01971-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Upstart Network, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Upstart Network, Inc.
Represented By: Kay Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LendingPoint, LLC
Represented By: Kay Fitz-Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Bank USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Rodriguez
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?