Dally v. GRH, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Edwin Dally
Defendant: DOES 1-10, RGC, Gaslamp, LLC, GRH, LLC and GRH, LLC doing business as Fifth and Rose
Case Number: 3:2019cv02002
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Linda Lopez
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to respond to complaint to on or before 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 11/26/2019. (jpp)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by GRH, LLC, RGC, Gaslamp, LLC. (Skeen, Spencer)Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party GRH, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Spencer C Skeen added to party RGC, Gaslamp, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Edwin Dally. RGC, Gaslamp, LLC served. (Taibi, Michael) (jpp).
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo) (jao).
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Edwin Dally. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmo) (jao).
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10, GRH, LLC, RGC, Gaslamp, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13069190.), filed by Edwin Dally. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02002-JLS-LL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Taibi, Michael)(jmo) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dally v. GRH, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RGC, Gaslamp, LLC
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRH, LLC
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRH, LLC doing business as Fifth and Rose
Represented By: Spencer C Skeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin Dally
Represented By: Michael A. Taibi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?