Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC et al v. Chicago Title Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Ovation Fund Management II, LLC, Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Banc of California, N.A., Randi Klee, Enrique Lombrozo, as co-trustee of the VIEN Trust dated, John Edwards, individually and on behalf of The Entrust Group, Inc. FBO John C. Edwards IRA 7230005154, Matt Schvimmer, as co-trustee of The Matthew and Gwen Schvimmer Family Trust of 2006 dated July 5, 2006, Matt Dorman, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Matthew Dorman IRA, and as co-trustee of the Dorman Family Trust dated, James St. John, individually and as co-trustee of James St. John & Patricia St. John Revocable Trust, dated May 17, 1994, Kenneth Stock, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Kenneth Stock IRA 566123, David Marks, Thomas Ramet, Viktor Cox, Kenneth Serio, Rajbir Sandhu, James Matheson, individually and as trustee of Carmel Country Trust dated and as trustee of the James S. Matheson Trust dated October 4, 2013, Jaianand Sethee, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Cardiff Insight, Inc. and Cardiff Insight 401k Trust, Inc, A-Team Global Management, Inc. on behalf of Second Source Solutions, LP, Thomas Harrison, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Thomas Harrison IRA 736752 and as co-trustee, or successor in interest, of the Harrison Family Trust dated, Wendy Huge, as trustee of the Meezers Retirement Plan, Rick Conner, individually and as co-trustee of the Conner Family Trust dated, Ralph Compton, as trustee of the Ralph V. Compton II Living Trust dated, Babak Shakib, on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Babak Shakib IRA 734329, Arne Mortensen, individually and as co-trustee of the Arne C. and Jonalee Mortensen Trust UDT, dated, Kay Darleen Hansen as trustee of the Hansen Living Trust, dated, Brian Chou, Miriam Frances Sells and Andrew Jay Sells as Trustees of the Mimi & Andy Sells Living Trust under declaration of trust dated June 1, 2013, Rikki Toupin, Satendra Sethee, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Satendra Sethee IRA, Marvin & Ardith Harris, Ron Marks, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Ronald G. Marks IRA 736752, Tacelosky, Michael, individually and on behalf of Michael E. Tacelosky 1994 Trust Fund, and IRA Services Trust Fund CFBO Michael Tacelosky IRA, Lianne Compton, as trustee of the Lianne Compton Living Trust dated, Eylon Geva, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Eylon Geva IRA 734718, Shana Edwards, Michael Geva, individually and as co-trustee of the Geva Family Trust, dated, Richard Burns, individually and on behalf of Sharp Rees-Stealy Medical Group, Inc. Money Purchase Plan for the benefit of Richard R. Burns, M.D., Robert Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Robert Lincoln IRA 794697, Tejinder Sethee, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Tejinder Sethee IRA, Peter Holman, individually and as co-trustee of the Holman Family Trust dated April 2, 2004, Jean Ann Hemingway, Michael Brock, individually and as trustee of the Michael P. Brock Rev. Trust, dated, Michael Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Michael Lincoln IRA 792640, Lester and Marlene H. Asch as co-trustees of the Lester and Marlene Asch Family Trust, dated, Steven Bernsen, individually and as co-trustee of the Bernsen Family Trust dated, Brian Cooper, on behalf of Severn River Capital Corporation, Noel & Irma Nazareno, individually and on behalf of 3N Properties Inc. 401k Plan, IRA Services Trust Company FBO Irma Nazareno, IRA 100079, David Sider, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Insider Mortgage Corp. Profit Sharing Plan, and D&M Global Holdings, Inc., Brian Toupin, Marc Brown, individually and as trustee of the Brown Family Trust dated June 17, 2010, Robert Blum on behalf of Sunflower 33, LP, Richard Klee, individually and on behalf of American Estate & Trust, LC FBO Richard Klee IRA, Matthew Goldstone, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Matthew Goldstone, IRA, Matthew Goldstone and Scott Hansen, individually and as co-trustee of the Hansen Family Trust dated July 13, 2011
Defendant: Chicago Title Company and Chicago Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv02031
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
2 Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
3 Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 27 MINUTE ORDER. Currently on calendar for Monday, 2/10/2020, at 11:15 a.m. is a hearing on Chicago Title's motion to dismiss. The Court finds this motion suitable for decision without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing on this motion is taken off calendar and this matter is taken under submission. No appearances will be required in this matter on 2/10/2020. Signed by the Chambers of Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 2/5/2020.(jdt)
January 31, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, To Stay filed by Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Steven M. Strauss In Support Of, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Strauss, Steven) (jdt).
January 10, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, To Stay filed by Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC. (Shipley, Michael) (jdt).
December 6, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, or in the Alternative, To Stay by Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Steven M. Strauss, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Steven M. Strauss)(Strauss, Steven) (jdt).
November 13, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Megan L. Donohue on behalf of Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company (Donohue, Megan)Attorney Megan L. Donohue added to party Chicago Title Company(pty:dft), Attorney Megan L. Donohue added to party Chicago Title Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 13, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Randall R. Lee on behalf of Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company (Lee, Randall)Attorney Randall R. Lee added to party Chicago Title Company(pty:dft), Attorney Randall R. Lee added to party Chicago Title Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 13, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Mazda K Antia on behalf of Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company (Antia, Mazda)Attorney Mazda K Antia added to party Chicago Title Company(pty:dft), Attorney Mazda K Antia added to party Chicago Title Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 13, 2019 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Financial, Inc. for Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Strauss, Steven) (jdt).
November 13, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Steven M Strauss on behalf of Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company (Strauss, Steven) (jdt).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The joint motion (Dkt. #15 ) is granted in part. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint by 12/6/2019 and must obtain a hearing date for any dispositive motion they wish to file. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/12/2019. (jdt)
November 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Blake E. Allred of case(s) 19-2129 . (Galdston, Benjamin). Modified on 11/12/2019 - QC email: Incorrect judges in caption. No refile (jdt).
November 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Galdston on behalf of Blake E. Allred (Galdston, Benjamin)Attorney Benjamin Galdston added to party Blake E. Allred(pty:ip) (jdt).
November 7, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint and Set Briefing Schedule by Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Strauss, Steven)Attorney Steven M Strauss added to party Chicago Title Company(pty:dft), Attorney Steven M Strauss added to party Chicago Title Insurance Company(pty:dft) (jdt). Modified on 11/13/2019 to correct title (jdt).
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel, Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-01628-LAB-AHG. The new case number is 19-cv-2031-LAB-AHG. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/1/19. Signed by Judge Larry Alan Burns on 10/30/19.(dlg)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by William J. Caldarelli on behalf of A-Team Global Management, Inc. on behalf of Second Source Solutions, LP, Steven Bernsen, individually and as co-trustee of the Bernsen Family Trust dated 2/27/2013, Robert Blum on behalf of Sunflower 33, LP, Michael Brock, individually and as trustee of the Michael P. Brock Rev. Trust, dated 5/31/1995, Marc Brown, individually and as trustee of the Brown Family Trust dated June 17, 2010, Richard Burns, individually and on behalf of Sharp Rees-Stealy Medical Group, Inc. Money Purchase Plan for the benefit of Richard R. Burns, M.D., Brian Chou, Lianne Compton, as trustee of the Lianne Compton Living Trust dated 6/9/2008, Ralph Compton, as trustee of the Ralph V. Compton II Living Trust dated 6/9/2008, Rick Conner, individually and as co-trustee of the Conner Family Trust dated 10/6/2016, Brian Cooper, on behalf of Severn River Capital Corporation, Viktor Cox, Matt Dorman, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Matthew Dorman IRA, and as co-trustee of the Dorman Family Trust dated 1/13/2010, John Edwards, individually and on behalf of The Entrust Group, Inc. FBO John C. Edwards IRA 7230005154, Shana Edwards, Eylon Geva, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Eylon Geva IRA 734718, Michael Geva, individually and as co-trustee of the Geva Family Trust, dated 5/8/2004, Scott Hansen, individually and as co-trustee of the Hansen Family Trust dated July 13, 2011, Marvin & Ardith Harris, Thomas Harrison, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Thomas Harrison IRA 736752 and as co-trustee, or successor in interest, of the Harrison Family Trust dated 4/25/2012, Peter Holman, individually and as co-trustee of the Holman Family Trust dated April 2, 2004, Randi Klee, Richard Klee, individually and on behalf of American Estate & Trust, LC FBO Richard Klee IRA, Michael Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Michael Lincoln IRA 792640, Robert Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Robert Lincoln IRA 794697, Enrique Lombrozo, as co-trustee of the VIEN Trust dated 8/18/1981, David Marks, Ron Marks, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Ronald G. Marks IRA 736752, James Matheson, individually and as trustee of Carmel Country Trust dated 12/28/2012 and as trustee of the James S. Matheson Trust dated October 4, 2013, Arne Mortensen, individually and as co-trustee of the Arne C. and Jonalee Mortensen Trust UDT, dated 4/23/1998, Noel & Irma Nazareno, individually and on behalf of 3N Properties Inc. 401k Plan, IRA Services Trust Company FBO Irma Nazareno, IRA 100079, Thomas Ramet, Matt Schvimmer, as co-trustee of The Matthew and Gwen Schvimmer Family Trust of 2006 dated July 5, 2006, Kenneth Serio, Jaianand Sethee, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Cardiff Insight, Inc. and Cardiff Insight 401k Trust, Inc, Babak Shakib, on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Babak Shakib IRA 734329, David Sider, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Insider Mortgage Corp. Profit Sharing Plan, and D&M Global Holdings, Inc., James St. John, individually and as co-trustee of James St. John & Patricia St. John Revocable Trust, dated May 17, 1994, Kenneth Stock, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Kenneth Stock IRA 566123, Miriam Frances Sells and Andrew Jay Sells as Trustees of the Mimi & Andy Sells Living Trust under declaration of trust dated June 1, 2013, Rajbir Sandhu, Matthew Goldstone, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Matthew Goldstone, IRA, Matthew Goldstone, Satendra Sethee, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Satendra Sethee IRA, Tejinder Sethee, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Tejinder Sethee IRA, Lester and Marlene H. Asch as co-trustees of the Lester and Marlene Asch Family Trust, dated 12/14/1994, Wendy Huge, as trustee of the Meezers Retirement Plan, Tacelosky, Michael, individually and on behalf of Michael E. Tacelosky 1994 Trust Fund, and IRA Services Trust Fund CFBO Michael Tacelosky IRA, Jean Ann Hemingway, Brian Toupin, Rikki Toupin, Kay Darleen Hansen as trustee of the Hansen Living Trust, dated 12/12/2007 (Caldarelli, William)Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party A-Team Global Management, Inc. on behalf of Second Source Solutions, LP(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Steven Bernsen, individually and as co-trustee of the Bernsen Family Trust dated 2/27/2013(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Robert Blum on behalf of Sunflower 33, LP(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Michael Brock, individually and as trustee of the Michael P. Brock Rev. Trust, dated 5/31/1995(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Marc Brown, individually and as trustee of the Brown Family Trust dated June 17, 2010(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Richard Burns, individually and on behalf of Sharp Rees-Stealy Medical Group, Inc. Money Purchase Plan for the benefit of Richard R. Burns, M.D.(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Brian Chou(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Lianne Compton, as trustee of the Lianne Compton Living Trust dated 6/9/2008(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Ralph Compton, as trustee of the Ralph V. Compton II Living Trust dated 6/9/2008(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Rick Conner, individually and as co-trustee of the Conner Family Trust dated 10/6/2016(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Brian Cooper, on behalf of Severn River Capital Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Viktor Cox(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Matt Dorman, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Matthew Dorman IRA, and as co-trustee of the Dorman Family Trust dated 1/13/2010(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party John Edwards, individually and on behalf of The Entrust Group, Inc. FBO John C. Edwards IRA 7230005154(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Shana Edwards(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Eylon Geva, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Eylon Geva IRA 734718(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Michael Geva, individually and as co-trustee of the Geva Family Trust, dated 5/8/2004(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Scott Hansen, individually and as co-trustee of the Hansen Family Trust dated July 13, 2011(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Marvin & Ardith Harris(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Thomas Harrison, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Thomas Harrison IRA 736752 and as co-trustee, or successor in interest, of the Harrison Family Trust dated 4/25/2012(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Peter Holman, individually and as co-trustee of the Holman Family Trust dated April 2, 2004(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Randi Klee(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Richard Klee, individually and on behalf of American Estate & Trust, LC FBO Richard Klee IRA(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Michael Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Michael Lincoln IRA 792640(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Robert Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Robert Lincoln IRA 794697(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Enrique Lombrozo, as co-trustee of the VIEN Trust dated 8/18/1981(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party David Marks(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Ron Marks, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Ronald G. Marks IRA 736752(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party James Matheson, individually and as trustee of Carmel Country Trust dated 12/28/2012 and as trustee of the James S. Matheson Trust dated October 4, 2013(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Arne Mortensen, individually and as co-trustee of the Arne C. and Jonalee Mortensen Trust UDT, dated 4/23/1998(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Noel & Irma Nazareno, individually and on behalf of 3N Properties Inc. 401k Plan, IRA Services Trust Company FBO Irma Nazareno, IRA 100079(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Thomas Ramet(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Matt Schvimmer, as co-trustee of The Matthew and Gwen Schvimmer Family Trust of 2006 dated July 5, 2006(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Kenneth Serio(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Jaianand Sethee, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Cardiff Insight, Inc. and Cardiff Insight 401k Trust, Inc(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Babak Shakib, on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Babak Shakib IRA 734329(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party David Sider, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Insider Mortgage Corp. Profit Sharing Plan, and D&M Global Holdings, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party James St. John, individually and as co-trustee of James St. John & Patricia St. John Revocable Trust, dated May 17, 1994(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Kenneth Stock, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Kenneth Stock IRA 566123(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to party Miriam Frances Sells and Andrew Jay Sells as Trustees of the Mimi & Andy Sells Living Trust under declaration of trust dated June 1, 2013(pty:pla), Attorney William J. Caldarelli added to par
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean Alan Ziehl on behalf of Banc of California, N.A. (Ziehl, Dean)Attorney Dean Alan Ziehl added to party Banc of California, N.A.(pty:pla) (dlg).
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC, Banc of California, N.A.. Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company served. (Shipley, Michael) (dlg).
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC re #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Fund Management II, LLC, Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC . (Shipley, Michael) (dlg).
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 10 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC, Banc of California, N.A.. Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company served. (Shipley, Michael) (dlg). Modified on 10/29/2019 (dlg).
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel Edward Haas on behalf of Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC (Haas, Nathaniel)Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Banc of California, N.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Nathaniel Edward Haas added to party Ovation Fund Management II, LLC(pty:pla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Saghar Esfandiarifard on behalf of Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC (Esfandiarifard, Saghar)Attorney Saghar Esfandiarifard added to party Banc of California, N.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Saghar Esfandiarifard added to party Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Saghar Esfandiarifard added to party Ovation Fund Management II, LLC(pty:pla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Alexander Pilmer on behalf of Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC (Pilmer, Robert)Attorney Robert Alexander Pilmer added to party Banc of California, N.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Alexander Pilmer added to party Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Alexander Pilmer added to party Ovation Fund Management II, LLC(pty:pla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark C. Holscher on behalf of Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC (Holscher, Mark)Attorney Mark C. Holscher added to party Banc of California, N.A.(pty:pla), Attorney Mark C. Holscher added to party Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Mark C. Holscher added to party Ovation Fund Management II, LLC(pty:pla)
October 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (jao).
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC of case(s) 19cv1628LAB-AHG. (smd) Modified on 10/22/2019 Proposed Low Number Order prepared and sent to Chambers (dlg).
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Banc of California, N.A., Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC. Identifying Corporate Parent Ovation Alternate Income Master Fund LP for Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC; Corporate Parent OFM II Ovation LP for Ovation Fund Management II, LLC; Corporate Parent Banc of California, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors, Other Affiliate Wellington Management Co. LLP for Banc of California, N.A.. (smd) (jao).
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Chicago Title Company, Chicago Title Insurance Company filed by Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC, Ovation Fund Management II, LLC, Banc of California, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13082462.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2031-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Shipley, Michael)(smd) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC et al v. Chicago Title Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovation Fund Management II, LLC
Represented By: Michael Shipley
Represented By: Saghar Esfandiarifard
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Nathaniel Edward Haas
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ovation Finance Holdings 2 LLC
Represented By: Michael Shipley
Represented By: Saghar Esfandiarifard
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Nathaniel Edward Haas
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Banc of California, N.A.
Represented By: Michael Shipley
Represented By: Dean Alan Ziehl
Represented By: Saghar Esfandiarifard
Represented By: Robert Alexander Pilmer
Represented By: Nathaniel Edward Haas
Represented By: Mark C. Holscher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randi Klee
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Lombrozo, as co-trustee of the VIEN Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Edwards, individually and on behalf of The Entrust Group, Inc. FBO John C. Edwards IRA 7230005154
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Schvimmer, as co-trustee of The Matthew and Gwen Schvimmer Family Trust of 2006 dated July 5, 2006
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Dorman, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Matthew Dorman IRA, and as co-trustee of the Dorman Family Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James St. John, individually and as co-trustee of James St. John & Patricia St. John Revocable Trust, dated May 17, 1994
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stock, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Kenneth Stock IRA 566123
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Marks
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Ramet
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viktor Cox
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Serio
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rajbir Sandhu
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Matheson, individually and as trustee of Carmel Country Trust dated and as trustee of the James S. Matheson Trust dated October 4, 2013
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaianand Sethee, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Cardiff Insight, Inc. and Cardiff Insight 401k Trust, Inc
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A-Team Global Management, Inc. on behalf of Second Source Solutions, LP
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Harrison, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Thomas Harrison IRA 736752 and as co-trustee, or successor in interest, of the Harrison Family Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Huge, as trustee of the Meezers Retirement Plan
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Conner, individually and as co-trustee of the Conner Family Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Compton, as trustee of the Ralph V. Compton II Living Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babak Shakib, on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Babak Shakib IRA 734329
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arne Mortensen, individually and as co-trustee of the Arne C. and Jonalee Mortensen Trust UDT, dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Darleen Hansen as trustee of the Hansen Living Trust, dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Chou
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriam Frances Sells and Andrew Jay Sells as Trustees of the Mimi & Andy Sells Living Trust under declaration of trust dated June 1, 2013
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rikki Toupin
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Satendra Sethee, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Satendra Sethee IRA
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin & Ardith Harris
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Marks, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Ronald G. Marks IRA 736752
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tacelosky, Michael, individually and on behalf of Michael E. Tacelosky 1994 Trust Fund, and IRA Services Trust Fund CFBO Michael Tacelosky IRA
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lianne Compton, as trustee of the Lianne Compton Living Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eylon Geva, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Eylon Geva IRA 734718
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shana Edwards
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Geva, individually and as co-trustee of the Geva Family Trust, dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Burns, individually and on behalf of Sharp Rees-Stealy Medical Group, Inc. Money Purchase Plan for the benefit of Richard R. Burns, M.D.
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Robert Lincoln IRA 794697
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tejinder Sethee, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Tejinder Sethee IRA
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Holman, individually and as co-trustee of the Holman Family Trust dated April 2, 2004
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean Ann Hemingway
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Brock, individually and as trustee of the Michael P. Brock Rev. Trust, dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lincoln, individually and on behalf of IRA Services Trust Company CFBO Michael Lincoln IRA 792640
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lester and Marlene H. Asch as co-trustees of the Lester and Marlene Asch Family Trust, dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Bernsen, individually and as co-trustee of the Bernsen Family Trust dated
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Cooper, on behalf of Severn River Capital Corporation
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noel & Irma Nazareno, individually and on behalf of 3N Properties Inc. 401k Plan, IRA Services Trust Company FBO Irma Nazareno, IRA 100079
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Sider, individually and as co-trustee of the Synapse Investment Partners Inc. Defined Benefit Plan and on behalf of Insider Mortgage Corp. Profit Sharing Plan, and D&M Global Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Toupin
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Brown, individually and as trustee of the Brown Family Trust dated June 17, 2010
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Blum on behalf of Sunflower 33, LP
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Klee, individually and on behalf of American Estate & Trust, LC FBO Richard Klee IRA
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Goldstone, American Estate and Trust, LC FBO Matthew Goldstone, IRA, Matthew Goldstone
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Hansen, individually and as co-trustee of the Hansen Family Trust dated July 13, 2011
Represented By: William J. Caldarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Company
Represented By: Mazda K Antia
Represented By: Steven M Strauss
Represented By: Megan L. Donohue
Represented By: Randall R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Mazda K Antia
Represented By: Steven M Strauss
Represented By: Megan L. Donohue
Represented By: Randall R. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?