Spurlin et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dale M. Spurlin and Mary Spurlin
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Crane Co., ITT Corporation, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., TATE ANDALE, LLC, Warren Pumps, LLC, Does 1 Through 400 and VIAD CORP
Case Number: 3:2019cv02049
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Co.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Davis, Geoffrey) (jpp).
December 18, 2019 Filing 42 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Crane Co..(Davis, Geoffrey)Attorney Geoffrey M. Davis added to party Crane Co.(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation will be held on 2/21/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. In the even the case does not settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference will be held. Joint Case management Statement due 2/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/17/2019.(lrf)
December 16, 2019 Filing 40 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by ITT Corporation.(Duffy, Joseph) (ag).
December 16, 2019 Filing 39 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc..(Duffy, Joseph) (ag).
December 11, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by IMO Industries, Inc..(Bailey, Bobbie) (jpp).
December 9, 2019 Filing 37 Defendant TATE ANDALE, LLC's ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by TATE ANDALE, LLC.(Sabnis, Rohit) (jpp).
December 9, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Glen R. Powell on behalf of Warren Pumps, LLC (Powell, Glen)(jpp).
December 9, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Warren Pumps, LLC.(Powell, Glen)Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Warren Pumps, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 9, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Glen R. Powell on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (Powell, Glen) (jpp).
December 9, 2019 Filing 33 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(Powell, Glen)Attorney Glen R. Powell added to party Air & Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft) (jpp).
December 5, 2019 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by VIAD CORP. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Langbord, Peter) (jpp).
December 5, 2019 Filing 31 ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by VIAD CORP.(Langbord, Peter)Attorney Peter Langbord added to party VIAD CORP(pty:dft)(jpp).
November 26, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy on behalf of ITT Corporation (Duffy, Joseph) (jpp).
November 26, 2019 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation identifying Other Affiliate ITT Inc. for ITT Corporation.. (Duffy, Joseph) (jpp).
November 26, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defendant ITT Corporation, Now Known as ITT LLC's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages by ITT Corporation.(Duffy, Joseph)Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT Corporation(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by IMO Industries, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings Inc for IMO Industries, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Duffy on behalf of Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. (Duffy, Joseph) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ebara Corporation, Other Affiliate Elliott Group Holdings, Inc. for Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc... (Duffy, Joseph) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 24 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defendant Elliott Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Damages by Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc..(Duffy, Joseph)Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Defendant Imo Industries Inc.'s Answer to Complaint for Damages by IMO Industries, Inc..(Bailey, Bobbie) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance Notice of Appearance of Bobbie Rae Bailey, Emily K. Doty, and Olga G. Pena by Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of IMO Industries, Inc. (Bailey, Bobbie)Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 21 Declination of Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (efiled as a MOTION) DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit text, efiling is not a motion. Duplicate of Doc 20. (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, (efiled as a MOTION) by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. (Park, Charles) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit text, efiling is not a motion. (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Park, Charles) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Park on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Park, Charles) Modified on 11/25/2019 to reflect Duplicate of Doc No. #14 . (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; L.R. 7.1-1) TO by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Defendant FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORPORATION is a wholly-owned, indirect subsidiary of Amec Foster Wheeler plc, a publicly traded company. (Park, Charles). (Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit text re interested party, wrong event selected) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; L.R. 7.1-1) TO by Foster Wheeler LLC (Park, Charles). Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit text to reflect Duplicate of Doc No. #13 ) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 15 Declination to Magistrate Judge (efiled as a MOTION DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION) by Foster Wheeler LLC. (Park, Charles) Modified on 11/25/2019 to edit text, efiling is not a motion. (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Park on behalf of Foster Wheeler LLC (Park, Charles) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES (FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1; L.R. 7.1-1) TO by Foster Wheeler LLC. Defendant FOSTER WHEELER LLC is a wholly-owned, indirect subsidiary of Amec Foster Wheeler plc, a publicly traded company. (Park, Charles). (Modified on 11/25/2019 to add text re interested party, wrong event selected). (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 12 FOSTER WHEELER ENERGY CORP ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Park, Charles)Attorney Charles Park added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 25, 2019 Filing 11 DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER LLC'S ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by Foster Wheeler LLC.(Park, Charles)Attorney Charles Park added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mary Spurlin, Dale M. Spurlin.New Summons Requested. (Frost, Scott) (jpp).
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by TATE ANDALE, LLC . Identifying Other Affiliate Robert M Tate, Other Affiliate Tate Andale Holdings, Inc. for TATE ANDALE, LLC. (Sabnis, Rohit) (jpp).
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TATE ANDALE, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Sabnis, Rohit) (jpp).
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rohit Ashok Sabnis on behalf of TATE ANDALE, LLC (Sabnis, Rohit) (jpp).
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand by TATE ANDALE, LLC.(Sabnis, Rohit)Attorney Rohit Ashok Sabnis added to party TATE ANDALE, LLC(pty:dft) (jpp).
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv2049-L-AHG.(no document attached) (mme)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Crane Co., Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, IMO Industries, Inc., ITT Corporation filed by Mary Spurlin, Dale M. Spurlin (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13093809). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2049-BEN-AHG. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Frost, Scott)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spurlin et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale M. Spurlin
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Spurlin
Represented By: Scott L Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbomachinery Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: Charles Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TATE ANDALE, LLC
Represented By: Rohit Ashok Sabnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Represented By: Glen R. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 400
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIAD CORP
Represented By: Peter Langbord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?