Lee et al v. Verimatrix Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Pyung Lee and Hee Sook Nam
Defendant: Robin Cooper, Verimatrix Inc and Inside Secure
Case Number: 3:2019cv02054
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332jd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Ex Parte Application for an Extension of Time to Amend the Complaint (Doc. #47 ). Plaintiffs must file an amended complaint on or before 3/30/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/16/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
March 13, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Errata by Robin Cooper re #50 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Tyrell, Paul). QC email: no provision to accept. No refile (jdt).
March 12, 2020 Filing 50 RESPONSE in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Petition, #46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Petition filed by Robin Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Tyrell, #2 Exhibit to Declaration of Paul Tyrell)(Tyrell, Paul) (jdt).
March 10, 2020 Filing 49 CLARIFICATION Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time to Amend Complaint (Doc. #47 ). The Court will interpret this motion as an ex parte application. Per Chambers Rules, ex parte applications that are not opposed within two Court days will be considered unopposed and may be granted on that ground. The duplicate motion (Doc. #46 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/10/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
March 10, 2020 Filing 48 PRO HAC APPROVED: William Chu appearing for Plaintiffs James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (rmc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Petition by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam. (Kaufman, David) (jdt).
March 9, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Petition by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam. (Chu, William) (jdt).
March 9, 2020 Filing 45 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13596095.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Chu, William) (rmc).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (Doc. #41 ). Should Plaintiffs choose to file an Amended Complaint, they must do so on or before 3/9/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/21/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jdt)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Approving Substitution of Attorney (Doc. #36 ). The Court approves the substitution of attorneys Ian G. Williamson and Erin A. Macleod of Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP in place of Condred Curtis Roberts, III and Edward P. Perrin, Jr. of Hallett & Perrin PC. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 12/20/2019. (Attorney Edward P Perrin, Jr and Condred Curtis Roberts, III terminated.) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
December 18, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of Joinder by Verimatrix Inc re #41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs First Amended Petition (Williamson, Ian) (jdt).
December 16, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Robin Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Paul A. Tyrell, #3 Proof of Service)(Tyrell, Paul) (jdt).
December 16, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric A. Plourde on behalf of Robin Cooper (Plourde, Eric)Attorney Eric A. Plourde added to party Robin Cooper(pty:dft) (jdt).
December 16, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A Tyrell on behalf of Robin Cooper (Tyrell, Paul)Attorney Paul A Tyrell added to party Robin Cooper(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 25, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Erin MacLeod by Erin MacLeod on behalf of Verimatrix Inc (MacLeod, Erin)Attorney Erin MacLeod added to party Verimatrix Inc(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 25, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance for Ian G. Williamson by Ian G. Williamson on behalf of Verimatrix Inc (Williamson, Ian) (jdt).
November 22, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION for Substitution of Counsel by Verimatrix Inc (Williamson, Ian) Attorney Ian G. Williamson added to party Verimatrix Inc(pty:dft). Modified on 11/25/2019 - QC email: Wrong event; proposed order attached. Changed event to Motion, edited text. No refile (jdt).
November 12, 2019 Filing 35 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 34 Electronic Transfer In. Mail sent to Salina Tariq. (jdt)
October 25, 2019 Filing 34 Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from Northern District of Texas. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00898. Original file received electronically
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES IN PART Defendant Cooper's motion to dismiss (Doc. #15 ) for lack of personal jurisdiction. Further, the Court GRANTS Defendant Cooper's motion to transfer venue (Doc. #15 ) pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1406(a). Accordingly, the Court hereby TRANSFERS this case to the Southern District of California, San Diego Division. Finally, because the Court exercises its discretion to transfer the case based on a lack of personal jurisdiction, the Court does not rule on the remaining arguments in Defendant Cooper's motion to dismiss (Doc. #15 ) or Defendant Verimatrix's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #18 ). Memorandum Opinion and Order denying in part #15 Motion to Dismiss filed by Robin Cooper re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 10/25/2019) (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.] Modified on 11/18/2019 - Updated docket to reflect #18 Motion to Dismiss denied as moot (jdt).
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Memorandum Opinion and Order denying #14 Motion to Remand (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 7/29/2019) (ykp) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 30 REPLY filed by Verimatrix Inc re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss (Perrin, Edward) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY filed by Robin Cooper re: #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 28 Appendix in Support filed by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam re #27 Response/Objection (Chu, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE filed by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam re: #18 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Chu, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #25 Motion to Extend Time to File Response. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions to dismiss is June 18, 2019. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/11/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #18 MOTION to Dismiss , #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer, #16 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Chu, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Motion to Substitute Attorney. John Lawrence, Allie Hale, and Baker Botts L.L.P. are permitted to withdraw as counsel for Verimatrix. Edward P. Perrin, Jr., Condred Roberts, and Hallett & Perrin, P.C. is permitted to substitute as lead attorneys for Verimatrix. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 6/10/2019) (chmb) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney John Benjamin Lawrence,Edward P Perrin, Jr,Condred Curtis Roberts, III for Verimatrix Inc. Motion filed by Verimatrix Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Lawrence, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE filed by Verimatrix Inc re: #14 First MOTION to Remand (Lawrence, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Appendix in Support filed by Robin Cooper re #20 Response/Objection to Opposed Motion to Remand (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE filed by Robin Cooper re: #14 First MOTION to Remand (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam. (Chu, William) Modified on 5/28/2019 to enhance text (dss). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Verimatrix Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lawrence, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 Appendix in Support filed by Robin Cooper re #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Robin Cooper re #15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 21, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Robin Cooper (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION to Remand filed by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Proposed Order) (Chu, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS (Exhibits) to #9 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiffs James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D) (Chu, William) Modified on 5/10/2019 (zkc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #7 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Amended Complaint, this motion is denied without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/8/2019) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #4 Motion to Dismiss. In light of the Amended Complaint, this motion is denied without prejudice. (Ordered by Judge Jane J. Boyle on 5/8/2019) (Judge Jane J. Boyle) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam. (Chu, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by James Pyung Lee, Hee Sook Nam. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chu, William) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Verimatrix Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Inside Secure for Verimatrix Inc. (Lawrence, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Verimatrix Inc with Brief/Memorandum in Support. (Lawrence, John) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Appendix in Support filed by Robin Cooper re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Robin Cooper re #4 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer filed by Robin Cooper (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (axm) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Robin Cooper. (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 134th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX, case number DC-19-00453 filed by Robin Cooper. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-9916461) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C-1, #4 Exhibit C-2, #5 Exhibit C-3, #6 Exhibit C-4, #7 Exhibit C-5, #8 Exhibit C-6, #9 Exhibit C-7, #10 Exhibit C-8, #11 Exhibit C-9, #12 Exhibit C-10, #13 Exhibit C-11, #14 Exhibit C-12, #15 Exhibit C-13, #16 Exhibit C-14, #17 Exhibit C-15, #18 Exhibit C-16, #19 Exhibit D, #20 Exhibit E, #21 Cover Sheet, #22 Cover Sheet Supplement) (Denny, David) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 10/25/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Verimatrix Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robin Cooper
Represented By: David Denny
Represented By: Bryan S David
Represented By: Eric A. Plourde
Represented By: Paul A Tyrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verimatrix Inc
Represented By: John Benjamin Lawrence
Represented By: Edward P Perrin, Jr
Represented By: Condred Curtis Roberts, III
Represented By: Ian G. Williamson
Represented By: Erin MacLeod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inside Secure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Pyung Lee
Represented By: William Chu
Represented By: Salina Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hee Sook Nam
Represented By: William Chu
Represented By: Salina Tariq
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?