Keely et al v. Skylab Apps, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Wolf, Heather Hollander Keely and Brittany Doster
Defendant: Dean Grey, Dean Kosage, Skylab Apps, Inc., Does 1-35, Skylab USA, Inc., Skylab, Economic Transformation Technologies Corporation, Skylab and Economic Transformation Technologies Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02078
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Karen S Crawford
3 Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 12/9/2019.(anh)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Dean Grey, Skylab Apps, Inc. re #3 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Lobbin, Stephen) (anh).
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Skylab Apps, Inc., Dean Grey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Lobbin, Stephen)Attorney Stephen M. Lobbin added to party Skylab Apps, Inc.(pty:dft) (anh).
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-01963-CAB-KSC. The new case number is 19cv2078-CAB-KSC. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 11/6/2019. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 11/5/2019.(jdt)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00042787-CU-OE-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13112481.), filed by Dean Grey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2078-LAB-AGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keely et al v. Skylab Apps, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Grey
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Kosage
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylab Apps, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Lobbin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-35
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylab USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylab, Economic Transformation Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skylab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Economic Transformation Technologies Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wolf
Represented By: Carlos Jato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Hollander Keely
Represented By: Carlos Jato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Doster
Represented By: Carlos Jato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?