Pablo et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Erika Pablo and Rosaline Pablo
Defendant: FCA US LLC and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2019cv02085
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff informed Court that settlement has been reached. Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference set for 12/10/2019 before Magistrate Judge Lopez are vacated. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 1/9/2020. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal is not filed by 1/9/2020, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 1/16/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/10/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
December 10, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Erika Pablo, Rosaline Pablo (Lopez, Julian). (jah).
December 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Thomas Martinez on behalf of FCA US LLC (Martinez, Jonathan). Attorney Jonathan Thomas Martinez added to party FCA US LLC (pty:dft). (jah).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Defendant FCA US LLC's #10 Motion for Telephonic Appearance of FCA US LLC's Client Representative at Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 12/5/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (jah)
December 3, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Excuse Appearance of FCA US LLC (client only) at ENE, by FCA US LLC. (Skanes, Mark)Attorney Mark William Skanes added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft) (jrm).
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Erika Pablo, Rosaline Pablo (Lopez, Julian)(jrm).
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued on First Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jah)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1 to 10, FCA US LLC, filed by Rosaline Pablo, Erika Pablo. New Summons Requested. (Lopez, Julian). Modified on 11/18/2019 - Edited text (jah).
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Daniel Lopez on behalf of Erika Pablo, Rosaline Pablo (Lopez, Julian). Attorney Julian Daniel Lopez added to party Erika Pablo(pty:pla), Attorney Julian Daniel Lopez added to party Rosaline Pablo (pty:pla). (jah).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/10/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez. In the event the case does not settle duringthe ENE, Court will conduct an Initial Case Management Conference. Joint Discovery Plan must be filed in CM/ECF by 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez on 11/1/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jah)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal), #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Gregg, Michael)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCA US LLC identifying Corporate Parent Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., Corporate Parent FCA North America Holding LLC for FCA US LLC.. (Gregg, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (jxv)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court- County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00051664-CU-CO-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13115775.), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit RISC, #4 Answer)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02085-BAS-LL. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(jxv) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pablo et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Pablo
Represented By: Nia K. Perkins
Represented By: Julian Daniel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosaline Pablo
Represented By: Nia K. Perkins
Represented By: Julian Daniel Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Michael John Gregg
Represented By: Mark William Skanes
Represented By: Jonathan Thomas Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?