Discoverorg Data LLC. v. Novacloud IT, LLC.
Plaintiff: Discoverorg Data LLC.
Defendant: Novacloud IT, LLC.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02105
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 2/3/2020 at 1:30 PM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. If the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct a Case Management Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 1/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 12/20/2019.(ag)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Novacloud IT, LLC. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Hoge, Charles) (ag).
December 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Novacloud IT, LLC..(Hoge, Charles)Attorney Charles T. Hoge added to party Novacloud IT, LLC.(pty:dft) (ag).
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Discoverorg Data LLC.. Novacloud IT, LLC. served. (Sands, Darin) (ag).
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Discoverorg Data LLC. identifying Corporate Parent DiscoverOrg Holdings, LLC for Discoverorg Data LLC... (jxv)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Novacloud IT, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13122791.), filed by Discoverorg Data LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02105-WQH-MSB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Sands, Darin)(jxv) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/1/2019: #2 Copyright Form) (jxv). Copyright form mailed 11/01/2019 (jxv). (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Discoverorg Data LLC. v. Novacloud IT, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discoverorg Data LLC.
Represented By: Darin Murl Sands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novacloud IT, LLC.
Represented By: Charles T. Hoge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?