In Re: Roark
Defendant: Leslie T. Gladstone Trustee
Appellant: Carlton Roark
Appellee: North Island Financial Credit Union, San Diego County Credit Union and California Credit Union
Case Number: 3:2019cv02117
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record by California Credit Union, North Island Financial Credit Union re #10 Notice of Appearance, (Goodwin, Van)(jrm).
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance with Proof of Service by Gerald N Sims on behalf of North Island Financial Credit Union, California Credit Union (Sims, Gerald)Attorney Gerald N Sims added to party North Island Financial Credit Union(pty:e), Attorney Gerald N Sims added to party California Credit Union(pty:e) (jrm).
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal and/or Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), (Attachments: #1 Second Submission of Appellee Leslie T. Gladstone Regarding Electronic Media Containing Transcript for the Record on Appeal for Certification and Transmission to District Court, #2 Appellee's TOC for Amended Supplemental Record, #3 Appelee's Amended Supplemental Appendix (Transcript))(Schmitt, T.)
January 3, 2020 Filing 11 Appellant's Opening Brief for Appeal of Bankruptcy Court Order by Appellant Carlton Roark. (jrm)
December 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION : REQUEST for Recognition as an Appellee and for Notice, with proof of service attached, by Leslie T. Gladstone Trustee (Batt, Christin)Attorney Christin A. Batt added to party Leslie T. Gladstone Trustee(pty:dft) (jrm).
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re: Bankruptcy Appeal: Responses due by 1/10/2020; Replies due by 1/24/2020; Reply set for 1/31/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal on Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), (Attachments: #1 18-90109, #2 18-90158, #3 18-04093, #4 NIFCU and CCU Submission of Electronic Media of Their Supplemental Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal)(Schmitt, T.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 5 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal and/or Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), (Attachments: #1 Appellee, Trustee's Supplemental Appendix (reduced), #2 Supplemental Electronic Media)(Schmitt, T.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 4 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal and/or Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), (Attachments: #1 Leslie T. Gladstone, Chapter 7 Trustee's Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal, #2 Request for Production of Transcript on Appeal)(Schmitt, T.)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal and/or Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), (Attachments: #1 North Island Financial Credit Union's And California Credit Union's Supplemental Designation of Record on Appeal)(Schmitt, T.)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Supplement to Transmittal of Appeal and/or Bankruptcy Matter (CSD 1257), (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record and Statement of Issues on Appeal, #2 Proof of Service)(Schmitt, T.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and Statement of Election. Bankruptcy Court case number: 18-4093LA7. BAP Number 1., filed by Carlton Roark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Transmittal, #3 Notice of referral, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02117-AJB-WVG. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Carlton Roark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: North Island Financial Credit Union
Represented By: Van Allyn Goodwin
Represented By: Gerald N Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: San Diego County Credit Union
Represented By: J Barrett Marum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: California Credit Union
Represented By: Gerald N Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie T. Gladstone Trustee
Represented By: Christin A. Batt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?