Sutherland v. Caliber Home Loans Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Isabella Sutherland
Defendant: Does 1-25 and Caliber Home Loans Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv02152
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441ac
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Granting Joint Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation Conference (ECF No. #7 ). Early Neutral Evaluation set for 1/7/2020 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/15/2019. (jrm)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice to Adverse Party and Court of Removal to Federal Court by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Daryanani, Jonesh) (jpp).
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference and Related Dates by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proof of Service)(Daryanani, Jonesh) (jpp).
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/11/2019 at 2:30pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes on 11/12/2019.(jpp)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill Louise Ripke on behalf of Caliber Home Loans Incorporated (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ripke, Jill)Attorney Jill Louise Ripke added to party Caliber Home Loans Incorporated (pty:dft) (jpp).
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate LSF6 Mid-Servicer Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate LSF6 Service Operations, LLC for Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (sxa)(jrd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal. (sxa)(jrd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (sxa)(jrd)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-00053251-CU-WT-CTL. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13146120.), filed by Caliber Home Loans Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration of Alyson Rochelle, #4 Declaration of Jill Ripke, #5 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02152-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutherland v. Caliber Home Loans Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans Incorporated
Represented By: Jill Louise Ripke
Represented By: Jonesh G. Daryanani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isabella Sutherland
Represented By: Christine M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?