Hernandez v. CDCR et al
Plaintiff: Ysidro Hernandez
Defendant: CDCR and - Chavez
Case Number: 3:2019cv02187
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 15 Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major assigned to transfer case from California Northern District. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jms)
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00401. Original file received electronically
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 11/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against CDCR, Chavez. Filed by Ysidro Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service, #2 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ysidro Hernandez (docket updated) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend. Amended Complaint due by 7/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
May 22, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend; Declaration in Support Thereof filed by Ysidro Hernandez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Mail sent to Prisoner's Finance Office returned for Better Address re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Mail Returned; response required by 7/19/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2019) Modified on 5/21/2019 Mail Re-sent to Full Address on Certificate of Service(sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Amended Complaint due by 6/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Judge Beth Labson Freeman. Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; finding as moot #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with Certificate of Funds filed by Ysidro Hernandez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 3/4/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/25/2019: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (sfbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ysidro Hernandez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ysidro Hernandez. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]
January 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CDCR, C.O. Chavez. Filed by Ysidro Hernandez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 11/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. CDCR et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ysidro Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?