Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD
Defendant: Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02204
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2020 Filing 5 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Poe)(Poe, Mark) (aef).
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 RESPONSE in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Quash filed by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of David S. Harris with Exhibits A-G, #2 Declaration of Alexander R. Safyan, #3 Proof of Service)(Harris, David)(sjm).
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD re #2 Order Setting Briefing Schedule,, (Poe, Mark) (mme).
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. On or before December 2, 2019, Plaintiff must serve a copy this Order on Arizona Beverages USA, LLC and on all of the subpoenaed entities. Any opposition to the motion must be filed on or before December 20, 2019. Any reply must be filed on or before January 10, 2020. Upon completion of the briefing, the Court will take the matter under submission pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1) and no personal appearances will be required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 11/21/2019.(aef)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Out of District Subpoena by Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD. (smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trepco Imports & Distribution, LTD
Represented By: Mark Poe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Represented By: David S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?