Koengeter v. Saul
Plaintiff: Nathan Koengeter
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv02228
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405id
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcelo Illarmo on behalf of Andrew Saul (Illarmo, Marcelo)Attorney Marcelo Illarmo added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft) (mme).
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nathan Koengeter. Andrew Saul served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Pena, Jonathan) (mme).
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (mme)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Application To Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 1/6/2020. (mme)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction, Pursuant to General Order 707, by Nathan Koengeter. (jxv)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY CASE ASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to General Order 707, United States Magistrate Karen S. Crawford has been randomly assigned. Plaintiff should print and complete the attached consent/declination form. The executed form must be received by the Clerk of Court within 21 days of the date of this notice. (smd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Nathan Koengeter. (smd)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul, IFP Filed, filed by Nathan Koengeter. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2228-KSC. Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford is assigned to the case. (Pena, Jonathan)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koengeter v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Marcelo Illarmo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Koengeter
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?