Bonilla v. Smith
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Defendant: Janet Smith Fournier, Randy Ontiveros, Eric Christensen, Floy E. Dawson, Gerald B. Diedich, James Lopez, William E. Smith, Susan Harris, Francie Kalhler, L. Quentin Smith and John Doe 1-40,000
Case Number: 3:2019cv02230
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Court 1) Denies Plaintiffs Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as barred by 28 U.S.C. 1915(g); 2) Dismisses this civil action without prejudice based on Plaintiffs failure to pay the full statutory and administrative $400 civil filing fee required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a); and 3) Certifies that an In Forma Pauperis appeal from this Order would be frivolous and therefore, would not be taken in good faith pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3)(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: 1) Denying Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis as Barred by 28 U.S.C. 1915(g) (ECF No. #5 ) and 2) Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice for Failure to Pay Filing Fee Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm)
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Wayne Bonilla. (jms)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting Document: Notification, from Plaintiff Steven Wayne Bonilla. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Case closed, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with his case, Plaintiff must either (a) prepay the entire $400 civil filing and administrative fee in full; or (b) complete and file a Motion to Proceed IFP which includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his Complaint., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/18/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jrm).
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting Document: Conflict of Interest, from Plaintiff Steven Wayne Bonilla. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: OTHER: Case closed, if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with his case, Plaintiff must either (a) prepay the entire $400 civil filing and administrative fee in full; or (b) complete and file a Motion to Proceed IFP which includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the 6-month period preceding the filing of his Complaint., Rejected document was returned to the filer. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/5/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2019: #1 Rejected Document) (jrm).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Dismissing Civil Action Without Prejudice for Failing to Pay Filing Fee Required by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a) and/or Failing to Move to Proceed in Forma Pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C 1915(a) by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff granted 30 days leave to pay full $400 fee or in the event plaintiff chooses to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff must complete and file motion mailed under penalty of perjury to proceed in forma pauperis, submit certified copy of prison trust account statement for 6 month period immediately preceding filing of complaint. If Plaintiff fails to either prepay the $400 civil filing fee or complete and submit the mailed Motion to Proceed IFP within 30 days, this action will remain dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiffs failure to satisfy 28 U.S.C. 1914(a)s fee requirements and without further Order of the Court. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/2/2019. [Motion to Proceed IFP mailed](All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eric Christensen, Floy E. Dawson, Gerald B. Diedich, John Doe 1-40,000, Janet Smith Fournier, Susan Harris, Francie Kalhler, James Lopez, Randy Ontiveros, L. Quentin Smith, William E. Smith, filed by Steven Wayne Bonilla.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Not Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2230-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Smith Fournier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Ontiveros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floy E. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald B. Diedich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francie Kalhler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Quentin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-40,000
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?