Rodriguez v. California Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: John C. Rodriguez
Defendant: California Department of Corrections and Dr. Thomas,,
Case Number: 3:2019cv02268
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Mississippi, Oxford Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Mississippi, Oxford Division*.*911 Jackson Ave.**Oxford, MS 38655*. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 1/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 Exhibits to #1 Complaint by John C. Rodriguez. (jms)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by John C. Rodriguez. (jms)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by John C. Rodriguez. (jms)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against California Department of Corrections, Thomas, filed by John C. Rodriguez.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CDCR Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2268-LAB-AHG. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. California Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Thomas,,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John C. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?