Hagberg v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Terence Hagberg
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, DOES 1 through 10, Affinia Default Services, LLC and Mortgage Electronic Registration Sytems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02379
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Remanding Case to State Court. The notice of removal fails to establish federal jurisdiction. This action is therefore remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California the County of San Diego. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/30/2017. (Certified copy mailed to state court)(lrf)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time [ECF No. #6 ]. For good cause shown pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b), the joint motion for extension of time to respond to the complaint (doc. no. #6 ) is granted. No later than 1/27/2020, Defendant shall serve and file a response, if any, to the complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/26/2019. (lrf)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC to Respond to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Bacon, Mary) Modified event on 12/26/2019 (lrf).
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge M. James Lorenz Rejecting re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC to Respond to Complaint, from Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF Policies and Procedures 2(f)(4): lacking signature certification. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 12/19/2019.(lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2019: #1 Rejected Document 4) (lrf).
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER #5 *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC to Respond to Complaint by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Bacon, Mary) (jpp). (Main Document 4 replaced on 12/19/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike on 12/19/2019 (lrf).
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge M. James Lorenz for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv2379-L-MDD.(no document attached) (jmo)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Sytems, Inc., Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings LLC for Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC; Corporate Parent MERSCORP Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Intercontinental Exchange, Inc., Corporate Parent Maroon Holdings, LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration Sytems, Inc... (Bacon, Mary) (jpp).
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00062069-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13260258.), filed by Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit - State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2379-MMA-MDD. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hagberg v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Mary Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Affinia Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Sytems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terence Hagberg
Represented By: Bonnie Lynn Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?