U.S. Bank National Association v. Somo et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Salem Somo
Case Number: 3:2019cv02421
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION Remand Case to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa)
February 14, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION Remand Case to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Coutts, Melissa)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court : Any response shall be filed on or before February 14, 2020. Any reply shall be filed on or before February 28, 2020. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for March 20, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/24/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa) (dlg).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. Judge William Q. Hayes, Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-00658-GPC-RBB. The new case number is 19cv2421-GPC-RBB.. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 12/20/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sjm)
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by U.S. Bank National Association of case(s) 19-cv-2248 19-cv-1938, 19-cv-1197, and 19-cv-658. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Coutts, Melissa) (ag). Modified on 12/20/2019 to note that a proposed LNO was prepared; related case 19cv658-GPC-RBB (ag).
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Salem Somo. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmr) (rmc).
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Salem Somo. (jmr) (rmc).
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00051776-CL-UD-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS117880.), filed by Salem Somo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit B)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02421-WQH-RBB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case.(jmr) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association v. Somo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Somo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?