Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2019cv02452
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 28:1338cp
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) QC mailer sent re: proposed order attached (tcf).
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (tcf).
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (rmc).
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13292570.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 AO 121 Copyright Report) [Copyright Report Mailed]The new case number is 3:19-cv-2452-JAH-LL. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D. Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?