Archi's Acres, Inc. et al v. Whole Foods Market California, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Archipley's Family Farm, Inc. and Archi's Acres, Inc.
Defendant: Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Does 1-50 and Whole Foods Market Service, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02478
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Archi's Acres, Inc.. Whole Foods Market California, Inc. served. (Garrison, Gregory) (jpp).
February 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Archi's Acres, Inc.. Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. served. (Garrison, Gregory) (jpp).
February 7, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Joinder by Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roistacher, Lee) (jpp).
February 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee H Roistacher on behalf of Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roistacher, Lee)Attorney Lee H Roistacher added to party Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp).
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Bennett on behalf of Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bennett, Matthew)Attorney Matthew E Bennett added to party Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp).
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Whole Foods Market California, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Roistacher, Lee) (jpp).
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee H Roistacher on behalf of Whole Foods Market California, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Roistacher, Lee)Attorney Lee H Roistacher added to party Whole Foods Market California, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp).
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E Bennett on behalf of Whole Foods Market California, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Bennett, Matthew)Attorney Matthew E Bennett added to party Whole Foods Market California, Inc. (pty:dft) (jpp).
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1-50, Whole Foods Market California, Inc., Whole Foods Market Service, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13305452.), filed by Archi's Acres, Inc., Archipley's Family Farm, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02478-JLS-MSB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Garrison, Gregory)(jxv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archi's Acres, Inc. et al v. Whole Foods Market California, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market California, Inc.
Represented By: Lee H Roistacher
Represented By: Matthew E Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whole Foods Market Service, Inc.
Represented By: Lee H Roistacher
Represented By: Matthew E Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archipley's Family Farm, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Archi's Acres, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?