FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC v. Generation Next Franchise Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC
Defendant: Tabitha Burke, Does 1 through 25, Christopher Maudlin, Arthur Budman, Thomas McChesney, Lavaille Lavette, Anthony Mauriello, Nicholas Yates, Generation Next Franchise Brands, Inc. and Ryan Polk
Case Number: 3:2019cv02496
Filed: December 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by Christopher Maudlin. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Christopher Maudlin, #3 Proof of Service (unsigned; accepted for filing by Judge Burns' chambers))(jdt)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Lavaille Lavette. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Lavaille Lavette and Proof of Service)(jdt)
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC (Without Prejudice Solely of Defendant Generation Next Franchise Brands, Inc.) (Case, Thomas) (jdt).
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC re #1 Complaint. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sxa)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC. No Corporate Parents / Interested Parties. (sxa)(jrd)
December 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Generation Next Franchise Brands, Inc., Arthur Budman, Tabitha Burke, Lavaille Lavette, Christopher Maudlin, Anthony Mauriello, Thomas McChesney, Ryan Polk, Nicholas Yates, Does 1 through 25. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13317209.), filed by FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Placement Memorandum, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Spring Debt Schedule, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - June 2019 Email, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - 6-D Company Debt, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Form 10-K, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F - Demand Letter)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02496-LAB-RBB. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Case, Thomas)(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC v. Generation Next Franchise Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tabitha Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Maudlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur Budman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas McChesney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavaille Lavette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Mauriello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generation Next Franchise Brands, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Polk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FirstFire Global Opportunities Fund, LLC
Represented By: Thomas H. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?