Ryu v. Intel Corporation
Petitioner: Hoseong Ryu
Respondent: Intel Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00027
Filed: January 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:0451
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Filing 33 Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from California Northern District. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-04093. Original file received electronically
January 6, 2020 Case transferred to the Southern District of California via ECF. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 31 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Motion Hearing held on 12/6/2019 - Re #24 Motion to Transfer Case filed by Intel Corporation - Granting #24 Motion to Transfer Case. (Total Time in Court: 2 Minutes) Court Reporter: Katherine Sullivan. Plaintiff Attorney: John T. Harrington (CourtCall). Defendant Attorney: Scott P. Jang. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 30 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case ) Objection to Reply Evidence (L.R. 7-3)(d)(1) filed byHoseong Ryu. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 11/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATIOON FOR PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO PARTICIPATE TELEPHONICALLY FOR HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #28 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Counsel will make arrangements through CourtCall (866) 582-6878. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 20, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION and [PROPOSED] Order to Appear by Telephone filed by Hoseong Ryu. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 11/20/2019) Modified on 11/21/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 27 Declaration of Lisa Gloor in Support of #26 Reply to Opposition/Response Defendant's Reply Re: Motion to Transfer Venue filed byIntel Corporation. (Related document(s) #26 ) (Jang, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 14, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY (re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case ) Reply In Support of Motion to Transfer Venue filed byIntel Corporation. (Jang, Scott) (Filed on 11/14/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 8, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. The correct case initials are CRB. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Re: #25 Opposition/Response to Motion filed by Hoseong Ryu. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
November 7, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #24 MOTION to Transfer Case ) filed byHoseong Ryu. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 11/7/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
October 24, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Intel Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor before Judge Charles R. Breyer. Responses due by 11/7/2019. Replies due by 11/14/2019. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration of Lisa Gloor, #3 Proposed Order)(Jang, Scott) (Filed on 10/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer: Granting #21 Motion to Appear by Telephone. (lsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Charles R. Breyer: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/11/2019. Defense counsel will file a Motion to Transfer Venue within 14 days. (Total Time in Court: 2 Minutes) Court Reporter: Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: John Harrignton (Tele). Defendant Attorney: Scott Jang. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/11/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION and [PROPOSED] Order to Appear by Telephone filed by Hoseong Ryu. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 10/7/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
October 4, 2019 Filing 20 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and [PROPOSED] Order filed by Hoseong Ryu. (Attachments: #1 Joint proposed discovery plan)(Harrington, John) (Filed on 10/4/2019) Modified on 10/7/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
September 24, 2019 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intel Corporation w/Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Jang, Scott) (Filed on 9/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
September 20, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint byIntel Corporation. (Boomer, Mitchell) (Filed on 9/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant to File a Responsive Pleading Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(a) filed by Intel Corporation. (Jang, Scott) (Filed on 8/29/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
August 19, 2019 #Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used. [err101]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #15 Certificate of Service filed by Hoseong Ryu. (mclS, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, summons and associated documents served on Intel Corporation (Defendant) on 08/09/2019, filed by Hoseong Ryu. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 8/16/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
August 16, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Hoseong Ryu. Intel Corporation served on 8/9/19, answer due 8/30/19. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 8/16/2019) Modified on 8/19/2019 (mclS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE: A Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/4/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 8:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 06, 17th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 Case REASSIGNED to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Susan Van Keulen no longer assigned to the case. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at #http://cand.uscourts.gov/news/225. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hoseong Ryu.. (Harrington, John) (Filed on 7/30/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/25/2019. (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Susan van Keulen on 7/25/19 (dmcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13549199.) filed by Hoseong Ryu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Oswald, R.) (Filed on 7/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13549139.) filed by Hoseong Ryu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Harrington, John) (Filed on 7/24/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Intel Corporation. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 10 /18/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2019 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/31/2019. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Glick, Gail) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13527065.). Filed byHoseong Ryu. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glick, Gail) (Filed on 7/17/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 1/6/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryu v. Intel Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hoseong Ryu
Represented By: R. Scott Oswald
Represented By: Gail Aviva Glick
Represented By: John Thomas Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Intel Corporation
Represented By: Kristel B. Haddad
Represented By: Mitchell F. Boomer
Represented By: Scott Philip Jang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?