Cortez et al v. Zhang et al
Plaintiff: Maria Cortez and Pedro Cortez
Defendant: Noelle Zhang, DOES 1-50 and Wei Zhang
Case Number: 3:2020cv00287
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiffs Complaint is dismissed without prejudice for failure to prepay the filing fee mandated by 28 U.S.C. 1914(a). Plaintiffs are granted thirty (30) days from the date on which this Order is electronically docketed to either (1) pay the entire $400 statutory and administrative filing fee, or (2) file a new IFP Motion alleging they are unable to pay the requisite fees. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/30/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20CV0287-JLS-RBB.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sjt)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maria Cortez, Pedro Cortez. (jmr)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-50, Noelle Zhang, Wei Zhang, IFP Filed, filed by Pedro Cortez, Maria Cortez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-00287-MMA-RBB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case.(jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez et al v. Zhang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pedro Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelle Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wei Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?