Gaito v. Smaller et al
Plaintiff: David Gaito and Gaito Ofra
Defendant: John Smaller, DOES 1 through 20 and Parkway Centre Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00350
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint by John Smaller. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Baucher, Carson) (jpp).
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard: Status Conference re Resetting the CMC and ENE held on 4/22/2020. Order to issue. (Plaintiff Attorneys Jonathan Gabriel and David Mayes). (Defendant Attorneys Ernest Slome and Carson Baucher). (no document attached) (kxm)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jpp)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DISSOLUTION against All Defendants, filed by David Gaito.New Summons Requested. (Gabriel, Jonathan) (jpp).
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER (1) Granting #6 Motion to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference; and (2) Setting Telephonic Status Conference. Attorneys-only Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Counsel shall call the chambers teleconference line at 1-877-873-8018 and use 8367902 as the access code to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 04/09/2020. (kxm)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Continue Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by John Smaller. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Smaller, #2 Declaration Declaration of Carson P. Baucher, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Baucher, Carson) (jpp).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2020 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Joint Case Management Statement due 4/13/2020. See order for mandatory procedures and deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 03/24/2020.(kxm)
March 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ernest Slome on behalf of John Smaller (Slome, Ernest)Attorney Ernest Slome added to party John Smaller(pty:dft) (jpp).
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by John Smaller. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Baucher, Carson)Attorney Carson Porter Baucher added to party John Smaller(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1 through 20, John Smaller ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13524848.), filed by David Gaito. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-350-JLS-AHG. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Gabriel, Jonathan)(smd)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaito v. Smaller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Gaito
Represented By: Jonathan Grant Gabriel
Represented By: Jonathan G. Gabriel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaito Ofra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Smaller
Represented By: Ernest Slome
Represented By: Carson Porter Baucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkway Centre Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?