Lemke v. Jander
Plaintiff: Richard G. Lemke
Defendant: Gary Dale Jander
Case Number: 3:2020cv00362
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER vacating hearing on #3 motion to dismiss and taking the matter under submission without oral argument. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/24/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Gary Dale Jander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jander, Gary) (jpp).
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant Gary Dale Jander. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Jander, Gary) (jpp).
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Gary Dale Jander. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Jander, Gary)Attorney Gary D. Jander added to party Gary Dale Jander(pty:dft) (jpp).
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Gary Dale Jander ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS119564.), filed by Richard G. Lemke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-362-JLS-KSC. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Lemke, Richard)(smd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemke v. Jander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard G. Lemke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Dale Jander
Represented By: Gary D. Jander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?