Langer v. Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Defendant: Does 1-10, Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. and Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00377
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (AGS): In light of the parties' notice of settlement (ECF No. #12 ), all pending dates are stricken. On June 22, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., the parties must jointly call Judge Schopler's chambers to provide an oral status report on the filing of the joint motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for initiating that joint call. Should the joint motion to dismiss be filed before that time, the obligation to call will be stricken without further Court order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 04/21/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates by Chris Langer (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Grace, Phyl) (jdt).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint (Doc. #10 ). Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC answer due 5/6/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/20/2020. (jdt)
March 18, 2020 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC. (Taylor, Corey)Attorney Corey E. Taylor added to party Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC(pty:dft). QC email: signature format. No refile (jdt).
March 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lodgment by Chris Langer re #8 Notice of Appearance (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Grace, Phyl) (jdt).
March 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Phyl Grace on behalf of Chris Langer (Grace, Phyl)Attorney Phyl Grace added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla) (jdt).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Doc. #4 ). Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. answer due 4/22/2020. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 3/16/2020. (jdt)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC served. (Handy, Russell) (jdt).
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt Valenti on behalf of Chris Langer (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Valenti, Matt)Attorney Matt Valenti added to party Chris Langer(pty:pla) (jdt).
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.. (Kohn, Andrew). QC email to w/d and refile or have signer for plaintiff file NOA; s/ by nonregistered user. (jdt).
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Chris Langer. Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. served. (Handy, Russell) (jdt).
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Does 1-10, Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC, Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13536322.), filed by Chris Langer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-377-W-AGS. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case. (Handy, Russell)(smd)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langer v. Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milan Real Estate Investments, LLC
Represented By: Corey E. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Langer
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Matt Valenti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?