Rodriguez v. Scripps Health
Plaintiff: Marcella Rodriguez
Defendant: Scripps Health
Case Number: 3:2020cv00439
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
3 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552fi
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED and the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (1) Granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis and (2) Dismissing Complaint without prejudice for failing to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED and the Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/23/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns, Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-02459-DMS-BLM. The new case number is 20cv0439-DMS-BLM. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/17/2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 3/12/2020. Motions set before Barbara Lynn Major.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jdt)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcella Rodriguez. (sjt)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Marcella Rodriguez. (sjt)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Scripps Health, IFP Filed. Filed by Marcella Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-439-LAB-LL. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Scripps Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scripps Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcella Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?