Meis v. Educational Credit Management Corporation
Plaintiff: Regina Meis
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00458
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Dismissal [Doc. No. #7 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 4/14/2020. (anh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Schannong, Martin) (anh).
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Educational Credit Management Corporation. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Schannong, Martin) (anh).
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by Educational Credit Management Corporation. (Schannong, Martin)Attorney Martin Schannong added to party Educational Credit Management Corporation(pty:dft) (anh).
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Regina Meis. Educational Credit Management Corporation served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Dech, Evangeline) (anh).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney Yana A. Hart for Plaintiff by Yana A. Hart on behalf of Regina Meis (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)Attorney Yana A. Hart added to party Regina Meis(pty:pla) (anh).
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Educational Credit Management Corporation (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13606003.), filed by Regina Meis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-458-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Dech, Evangeline)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meis v. Educational Credit Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Meis
Represented By: Evangeline Athena Dech
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Educational Credit Management Corporation
Represented By: Martin Schannong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?