Trim v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martin Trim
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00481
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: M James Lorenz
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by CMRE Financial Services, Inc. of case(s) 8:20-cv-00532-DOC-ADS - Elhendi v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaminski, David) (jpp).
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen A. Watkins on behalf of CMRE Financial Services, Inc. (Watkins, Stephen)Attorney Stephen A. Watkins added to party CMRE Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/12/2020 at 9:30am. Joint Discovery Plan due 6/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 5/05/2020.(jpp) (dlg).
May 5, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) (jpp).
May 5, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by CMRE Financial Services, Inc..(Kaminski, David) (jpp).
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Abbas Kazerounian on behalf of Martin Trim (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas)Attorney Abbas Kazerounian added to party Martin Trim(pty:pla) (jpp).
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to extend time to respond to complaint to no later than 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/22/2020. (jpp) (dlg).
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party CMRE Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (jpp).
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Trim. CMRE Financial Services, Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jpp).
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Martin Trim (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Martin Trim(pty:pla) (jpp).
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against CMRE Financial Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13620731.), filed by Martin Trim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-481-L-BLM. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trim v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Represented By: Stephen A. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Trim
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?