Charman v. Outboundengine, Inc.
Plaintiff: Charman and Thane Charman
Defendant: Outboundengine, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00490
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thane Charman of Action without Prejudice (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #4 ). Defendant shall file its response to the Complaint by 5/8/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/8/20. (jmo) (dlg).
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Outboundengine, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Zugsay, Kathleen) (jmo).
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Zugsay on behalf of Outboundengine, Inc. (Zugsay, Kathleen) (jmo).
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Outboundengine, Inc.. (Zugsay, Kathleen)Attorney Kathleen Zugsay added to party Outboundengine, Inc. (pty:dft) (jmo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alex S. Madar on behalf of Thane Charman (Madar, Alex)Attorney Alex S. Madar added to party Thane Charman(pty:pla) (jmo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Outboundengine, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13630255.), filed by Thane Charman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-490-BAS-AHG. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charman v. Outboundengine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Outboundengine, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen Zugsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thane Charman
Represented By: Alex S. Madar
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?