Nichols v. Ruby Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Nichols and Ashley Nichols
Defendant: Ruby Corp, ADL Media Inc., Does 1-100, Ruby Corp. and Ruby Life Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00491
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1453
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: In light of the recently filed Notice of Settlement, a telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference has been scheduled for 7/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephonic conference by calling Judge Crawford's chambers with all counsel on the line. The Court will vacate the conference if the parties submit the appropriate dismissal papers before 7/10/2020.(no document attached) (plh)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Ashley Nichols (Conforti, Clark) (jmo).
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Clark Robert Conforti on behalf of Ashley Nichols (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Conforti, Clark)Attorney Clark Robert Conforti added to party Ashley Nichols(pty:pla) (jmo).
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Second Joint Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. #6 ). Defendants response to the First Amended Complaint due 5/13/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/21/20. (jmo)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by ADL Media Inc., Ruby Corp., Ruby Life Inc.. (Hsu, Linda) (jmo). Added MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on 4/21/2020 to correct event (jmo).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint on or before April 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 3/20/20. (dlg)
March 20, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to First Amended Complaint by ADL Media Inc., Ruby Corp., Ruby Life Inc.. (Hsu, Linda) (jmo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ADL Media Inc., Ruby Corp., Ruby Life Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Hsu, Linda)(jmo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by ADL Media Inc., Ruby Corp., Ruby Life Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Hsu, Linda) (jmo).
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00057112-CL-MC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCASDC-13630201.), filed by ADL Media Inc., Ruby Corp., Ruby Life Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B - State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)The new case number is 3:20-cv-491-BAS-KSC. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nichols v. Ruby Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADL Media Inc.
Represented By: Linda C. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Corp.
Represented By: Linda C. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby Life Inc.
Represented By: Linda C. Hsu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Nichols
Represented By: Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Clark Robert Conforti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?