Juarez v. Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Silvino Juarez
Defendant: DOES 1-10, EA Health Billing Inc., Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation and Progressive Management Systems
Case Number: 3:2020cv00505
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by EA Health Billing Inc., Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation re #5 Answer to Complaint (Keary, Grant) (ag).
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint and Proof of Service by EA Health Billing Inc., Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation.(Keary, Grant)Attorney Grant C Keary added to party EA Health Billing Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Grant C Keary added to party Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation(pty:dft) (ag).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/17/2020 at 1:30 PM in the chambers of Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. If the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct a Case Management Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 6/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 3/25/2020.(ag) Modified on 3/30/2020 to correct hearing date (ag).
March 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Progressive Management Systems . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kirkpatrick, Debbie) (ag).
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Progressive Management Systems. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kirkpatrick, Debbie) (ag).
March 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00066610-CL-MC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13634402.), filed by Progressive Management Systems. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-505-WQH-MSB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juarez v. Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EA Health Billing Inc.
Represented By: Grant C Keary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Emergency and Acute Care Medical Corporation
Represented By: Grant C Keary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Management Systems
Represented By: Debbie P. Kirkpatrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silvino Juarez
Represented By: Andrew Paul Rundquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?