Trepco Imports & Distribution, Ltd. v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Plaintiff: Trepco Imports & Distribution, Ltd.
Defendant: Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00521
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: M James Lorenz
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0013
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Arizona Beverages USA, LLC re 1 Motion to Enforce Out of District Subpoena,, (Harris, David) (jpp).
March 20, 2020 Filing 2 Fee for Civil Case Opening: $ 400, receipt number ACASDC-13653929, Paid on 3/20/2020. (no document attached) (Harris, David) (jpp).
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION TO COMPEL NON-PARTY RETAILERS TO COMPLY WITH DOCUMENT SUBPOENAS by Trepco Imports & Distribution, Ltd. (no document attached) (jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trepco Imports & Distribution, Ltd. v. Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Beverages USA, LLC
Represented By: David S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trepco Imports & Distribution, Ltd.
Represented By: David S. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?