Petconnect Rescue, Inc. v. Salinas et al
Plaintiff: Petconnect Rescue, Inc., Lucky Pup Dog Rescue.Com and Sarah Gonzalez
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, Jase Demetrius Shamore, Ray Rothman, Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC, 360 Clean N Go, LLC, The Puppy Store, LLC, Pet Connect Rescue, Inc., Alysia Rothman, David Salinas, Veronica Salinas, Richard Robles Pena, Rickie Gallardo, Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc., Pups & Pets, Town Puppies, Josh Anguino, National City Puppy, LLC, Hello Puppies, Cindy Lee Duhamell, Ryan Lorenz, Fancy Puppy, LLC, The Pupply Store Las Vegas, LLC, Broadway Puppies, Puppies 4 Less, Jason Huihammel, Villaggio Family Pets, Virgo Castro Zusa, Temecula Puppies, Life7, LLC and Trevor Duggan
Case Number: 3:2020cv00527
Filed: March 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Sarah Gonzalez, Lucky Pup Dog Rescue.Com, Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Pease, #2 Declaration Parrett)(Pease, Bryan)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, filed by Sarah Gonzalez, Lucky Pup Dog Rescue.Com, Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Champlin, #2 Declaration Fukumoto, #3 Declaration Koller, #4 Declaration Pease, #5 Declaration Parrett, #6 Declaration Honowitz, #7 Declaration Middleton)(Pease, Bryan)
May 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Notice of Joinder by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice Notice of Joinder in Motion to Strike)(Najjar, George)(sxa).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SUR-REPLY - re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Objections, #2 Declaration Richard Pena, #3 Declaration Ray Rothman, #4 Declaration George R. Najjar)(Najjar, George) (sxa).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION Joinder in Motion to Dismiss re #27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, by Life7, LLC, Ryan Lorenz. (Attachments: #1 Notice Defendants Ryan Lorenz and Life7, LLC's Joinder in Motion to Strike)(Long, Michael)Attorney Michael Francis Long added to party Life7, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Francis Long added to party Ryan Lorenz(pty:dft) (sxa).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Declaration of Jase Demetrius Shamore in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, Jase Demetrius Shamore. (Long, Michael) (sxa).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, Jase Demetrius Shamore. (Long, Michael) (sxa).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc., Lucky Pup Dog Rescue.Com, Sarah Gonzalez. Josh Anguino, Cindy Lee Duhamell, Jason Huihammel, Puppies 4 Less served. (Pease, Bryan)(sxa).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike #16 Amended Complaint, by Rickie Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Motion to Dismiss, #2 Notice Motion to Strike, #3 Memo of Points and Authorities Motion to Strike)(Najjar, George)Attorney George R. Najjar added to party Rickie Gallardo(pty:dft) (sxa).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc., as to Fancy Puppy, LLC, National City Puppy, LLC, Pet Connect Rescue, Inc., Richard Robles Pena, Alysia Rothman, Ray Rothman, David Salinas, Veronica Salinas, Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc., The Pupply Store Las Vegas, LLC, The Puppy Store, LLC, Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC, Virgo Castro Zusa. (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. . (sxa) (rmc).
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER. Given the new evidence presented in Plaintiff's reply, and given the ongoing national COVID-19 emergency, the Court grants Defendants leave to file a surreply on or before 5/11/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/14/2020.(sxa) (rmc).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OBJECTION by Petconnect Rescue, Inc. re #22 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #21 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Declaration (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental - New Lanham Act Allegations filed by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Najjar, George) (sxa).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Supplemental Declaration by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Najjar, George) (sxa).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY - Other re #11 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement reply, #2 Declaration Bokma, #3 Declaration Middleton, #4 Declaration Chanock, #5 Declaration Pease, #6 Declaration Boks, #7 Declaration Ceron, #8 Declaration Maher, #9 Declaration Matias, #10 Declaration Voulgaris DVM, #11 Declaration Zapata)(Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Errata filed by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Najjar, George) (sxa).
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Denying #10 #14 #15 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss the Complaint as Moot. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 4/7/2020. (sxa) (rmc).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #14 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #15 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint filed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against 360 Clean N Go, LLC, Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, DOES 1-10, Rickie Gallardo, Pet Connect Rescue, Inc., Richard Robles Pena, Alysia Rothman, Ray Rothman, David Salinas, Veronica Salinas, Jase Demetrius Shamore, Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc., The Puppy Store, LLC, Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC, filed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement redline)New Summons Requested. (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
April 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss by Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Najjar, George)Attorney George R. Najjar added to party Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc.(pty:dft) (sxa).
April 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by 360 Clean N Go, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Najjar, George)Attorney George R. Najjar added to party 360 Clean N Go, LLC(pty:dft) (sxa).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Evidentiary Objections filed by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Najjar, George) (sxa).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, Jase Demetrius Shamore. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Long, Michael)Attorney Michael Francis Long added to party Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Francis Long added to party Jase Demetrius Shamore(pty:dft) (sxa).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, Jase Demetrius Shamore. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Jase Demetrius Shamore in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Declaration Declaration of Robert Torres in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, #3 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Long, Michael) (sxa).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Dismiss Verified Complaint by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Ex Parte Application to Dismiss)(Najjar, George)Attorney George R. Najjar added to party Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC(pty:dft) (sxa).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Opposition Declaration of George R. Najjar, Esq., to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for TRO, #2 Declaration Opposition Declaration of Richard Pena to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for TRO, #3 Declaration Opposition Declaration of Ray Rothman to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for TRO, #4 Declaration Opposition Declaration of David Salinas to Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application for TRO)(Najjar, George) (sxa).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Petconnect Rescue, Inc. re #4 Order,,, Motions Submitted,, #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #1 Complaint,, (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Petconnect Rescue, Inc. of case(s) 20cv581 . (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC served. (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. Jase Demetrius Shamore served. (Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER on #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court takes this matter under submission. The Court orders Plaintiff to serve its complaint, motion, and a copy of this scheduling order upon Defendants as soon as possible and to file a proof of service. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiff's motion for a temporary restraining order is due on or before April 3, 2020. Plaintiff's reply is due on or before April 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 3/20/2020. (smy)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Pease, #3 Declaration Taft, #4 Declaration Henry, #5 Declaration Honowitz)(Pease, Bryan) (sxa).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 360 Clean N Go, LLC, Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC, DOES 1-10, Rickie Gallardo, Pet Connect Rescue, Inc., Richard Robles Pena, Alysia Rothman, Ray Rothman, David Salinas, Veronica Salinas, Jase Demetrius Shamore, Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc., The Puppy Store, LLC, Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13653431.), filed by Petconnect Rescue, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-527-H-KSC. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Pease, Bryan)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petconnect Rescue, Inc. v. Salinas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critters and Pets/Furry and Feather, LLC
Represented By: Michael Francis Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jase Demetrius Shamore
Represented By: Michael Francis Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yellow Store Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: George R. Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 360 Clean N Go, LLC
Represented By: George R. Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Puppy Store, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pet Connect Rescue, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alysia Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Robles Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rickie Gallardo
Represented By: George R. Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Socal Puppy Adoptions, Inc.
Represented By: George R. Najjar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pups & Pets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town Puppies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Anguino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National City Puppy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hello Puppies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Lee Duhamell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Lorenz
Represented By: Michael Francis Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fancy Puppy, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pupply Store Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broadway Puppies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puppies 4 Less
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Huihammel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Villaggio Family Pets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgo Castro Zusa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temecula Puppies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life7, LLC
Represented By: Michael Francis Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trevor Duggan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Petconnect Rescue, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucky Pup Dog Rescue.Com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?