Edwards v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Edwards
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00547
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Transfer Letter Received from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case number in other court is 8:20-cv-00611 (mme)
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*.*312 N. Spring St**Los Angeles, CA 90012*. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (anh)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 3/24/2020.(anh)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01134117-CU-BC-CJC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13659735.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration of M. Proudfoot in Support of Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-547-CAB-JLB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen L. Edwards
Represented By: Jim O Whitworth
Represented By: Jim O. Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?