Chi v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Craig Chi
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50 and Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00549
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
2 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2020 Filing 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin: An Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference was held on 5/21/2020. The case did not settle. A scheduling order will issue. (Plaintiff Attorney Jim Whitworth). (Defendant Attorney Matthew Proudfoot). (no document attached) (atk)
May 19, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet. Telephonic ENE/CMC set for 05/21/2020 at 9:30AM. (atk)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference currently scheduled for May 21, 2020 at 9:30AM will be TELEPHONIC. Only counsel are required to participate. Counsel are ordered to use the dial-in information filed as a separate notice to access the Court's teleconference service. (The teleconference information sheet can be accessed through ECF using the login information assigned to an attorney of record in the case and then selecting the report option. On the next screen, the docket sheet option should be selected, prompting the user for a PACER login (assigned to the attorney of record). Once the PACER login is completed, the case number can be entered which will display the docket sheet for the case and allow the user to open the teleconference information sheet.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 05/19/2020.(no document attached) (atk)
May 14, 2020 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (aef).
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (aef).
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Craig Chi. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jim O. Whitworth, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Whitworth, Jim) (aef).
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Craig Chi. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Amended Declaration of Jim O. Whitworth, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Whitworth, Jim) (aef).
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Craig Chi. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Jim O. Whitworth, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Whitworth, Jim) (aef).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference are set for 5/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/3/2020.(aef)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20CV0549-DMS(MDD). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/01/2020.(jpp)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California County of Orange, case number 30-2020-01134105-CU-BC-CJC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13659875.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Exhibit A-B)The new case number is 3:20-cv-549-JLS-MDD. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chi v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Chi
Represented By: Jim O Whitworth
Represented By: Jim O. Whitworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?