Equihua et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonia Galvez and Samuel Equihua
Defendant: Does 1- 10 and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00633
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 pl
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action filed by Samuel Equihua, Antonia Galvez. (Lopez, Julian) (ag).
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Samuel Equihua, Antonia Galvez. (Lopez, Julian) (ag).
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by FCA US, LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag).
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Samuel Equihua, Antonia Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Notice)(Moses, Jeffrey) (ag).
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by FCA US, LLC re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag).
April 29, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Sixth Cause of Action by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag).
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1- 10, FCA US, LLC, filed by Samuel Equihua. (Moses, Jeffrey) (ag).
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US, LLC. Corporate Parent FCA North American Holdings, LLC With Financial Interest. (jxv) Modified on 4/1/2020 (jxv).
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Jury Demand From State of CA, Superior Court, San Diego County, case number 37-02020-00011524-CU-BC-NC. (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-13693572.), filed by FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Declaration M. Proudfoot in Support of Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-633-WQH-MDD. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equihua et al v. FCA US, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonia Galvez
Represented By: Jeffrey Orville Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Equihua
Represented By: Jeffrey Orville Moses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1- 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?