Fischer et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: John IV Fischer, Janice Fischer and John Fischer, IV
Defendant: Does 1 through 10 and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00707
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Marilyn L Huff
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 8/24/2020. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 8/24/2020, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 8/28/2020 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(sxa)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER re proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 5/27/2020. Case conditionally settled. (Plaintiff Attorney Timothy M. Whelan). (Defendant Attorney Matthew M. Proudfoot). (John J. Fischer IV, Janice Fischer, James Sheridan). The Court SETS a telephonic, counsel-only Status Conference for 6/5/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Burkhardt. For purposes of the conference, the parties shall use the Court's conference line: (877) 873-8018; Access Code: 9930765. (no document attached) (cxe)
May 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance of Timothy Whelan by Mark Romano on behalf of Janice Fischer (Romano, Mark) (sxa).
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: In light of the Court's #8 Order Converting the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference to Video Conferences, the Court DENIES AS MOOT the parties' #7 Joint Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. (no document attached) (cxe)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Converting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference to Video Conference and Issuing Updated Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 5/21/2020.(sxa)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at 05/27/20 Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference by John Fischer, IV. (Romano, Mark) (sxa).
May 7, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by John Fischer, IV (Romano, Mark) (sxa).
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Janice Fischer. (Romano, Mark) (sxa).
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 5/27/2020 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Case Management Conference set for 5/27/2020 01:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Joint Discovery Plan due 5/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 4/17/2020.(sxa) (rmc).
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by FCA US LLC. (vxc) (dsn)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by FCA US LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Fiat Chrysler Automobiles, N.V., Other Affiliate FCA North America Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate FCA Holdco B.V. for FCA US LLC. (vxc) (dsn)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00013755-CU-BC-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13741890.), filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration, #3 Notice)The new case number is 3:20-cv-707-H-JLB. Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fischer et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John IV Fischer
Represented By: Mark Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Fischer
Represented By: Mark Romano
Represented By: Timothy Michael Whelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Fischer, IV
Represented By: Mark Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?