Avilez v. Deroode
Plaintiff: Frederico Sanchez Avilez
Defendant: David John Deroode
Case Number: 3:2020cv00722
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 pi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation and (2) Setting Rule 26 compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/14/2020 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 5/07/2020.(jpp) (dlg).
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by David John Deroode.(Wright, Viretha)(jpp).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of CA, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00018991-CU-PA-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13749758). Filed by David John Deroode. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Declaration)The new case number is 3:20-cv-722-JLS-AGS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(sjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avilez v. Deroode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David John Deroode
Represented By: Viretha Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederico Sanchez Avilez
Represented By: Andy Van Le
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?