Cleveland v. SK Energy Americas, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Asante Cleveland
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-75, Vitol Inc., SK Energy Americas, Inc and SK Trading International Co. Ltd.
Not Classified By Court: The People Of The State of California
Case Number: 3:2020cv00893
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1337sc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 Transfer Letter Received from California Northern District. Case number in other court is 5:20-cv-04502 (mme)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 Case transferred to Northern District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *Northern District of California*.*450 Golden Gate Avenue**San Francisco, CA 94102*. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (tcf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Waiver of Service of the Summons and Complaint by Asante Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Azar, David) (tcf).
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc. re #3 MOTION to Intervene Ex Parte Motion To Intervene And Transfer Action Pursuant To 28 USC 1404 And The First-filed Doctrine, Or In The Alternative To Stay (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Lebsock, Christopher)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by The People Of The State of California (Attachments: #1 Supplement San Francisco Superior Court Notice of Related Case pursuant to CRC 3.300)(Battaglia, Michael)Attorney Michael D. Battaglia added to party The People Of The State of California(pty:misc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY - Other re #5 Non Opposition to Motion, #3 MOTION to Intervene Ex Parte Motion To Intervene And Transfer Action Pursuant To 28 USC 1404 And The First-filed Doctrine, Or In The Alternative To Stay filed by Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.. (Lebsock, Christopher) (ag).
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NON Opposition re #3 MOTION to Intervene Ex Parte Motion To Intervene And Transfer Action Pursuant To 28 USC 1404 And The First-filed Doctrine, Or In The Alternative To Stay filed by Asante Cleveland. (Azar, David) (ag).
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ENTRY: The briefing schedule on the Motion to Intervene and Transfer filed by Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc. (ECF No. #3 ), is as follows: Any opposition to the Motion to Intervene and Transfer shall be filed on or before June 8, 2020. Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc., shall file any reply on or before June 15, 2020. There will be no oral argument unless requested by the Court. (no document attached) (ag)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Intervene Ex Parte Motion To Intervene And Transfer Action Pursuant To 28 USC 1404 And The First-filed Doctrine, Or In The Alternative To Stay by Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Lebsock, Christopher)Attorney Christopher L. Lebsock added to party Pacific Wine Distributors, Inc.(pty:ip) (ag).
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against SK Energy Americas, Inc., SK Trading International Co. Ltd., Vitol Inc., John Doe Corporations 1-75, (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-13865228.), filed by Asante Cleveland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-893-WQH-LL. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Azar, David)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cleveland v. SK Energy Americas, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-75
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitol Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Energy Americas, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SK Trading International Co. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asante Cleveland
Represented By: David E Azar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: The People Of The State of California
Represented By: Michael D. Battaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?