Mendez v. Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA et al
Plaintiff: Christina Mendez
Defendant: Scott Kirkpatrick, Bioscience Americas, LLC, Giostar Labs, Inc., Anand Srivastava, Siddharth Bhavsar, Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA and Deven Patel
Case Number: 3:2020cv00915
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
2 Judge: Todd W Robinson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Siddharth Bhavsar, Giostar Labs, Inc., Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA, Scott Kirkpatrick, Deven Patel, Anand Srivastava. (Seth, Sandeep) (sxa).
September 28, 2020 Filing 21 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Christina Mendez re #20 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Spector, Naomi) (sxa).
September 28, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Christina Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Naomi B. Spector, #2 Exhibit A-D to Declaration of Naomi B. Spector)(Spector, Naomi) (sxa).
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 20-CV-915-TWR-BLM. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 9/23/2020.(anh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 18 Minute Order: The joint motion for a five-page extension for Plaintiffs opposition to the pending motion to dismiss [Doc. No. #17 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiffs opposition may be up to thirty pages in length. It is SO ORDERED. (anh)
September 22, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Christina Mendez. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
August 31, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Siddharth Bhavsar, Giostar Labs, Inc., Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA, Scott Kirkpatrick, Deven Patel, Anand Srivastava. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Dr. Anand Srivastava, #3 Declaration of Deven Patel, #4 Declaration of Scott Kirkpatrick, #5 Declaration of Siddharth Bhavsar)(Seth, Sandeep)Attorney Sandeep Seth added to party Siddharth Bhavsar(pty:dft), Attorney Sandeep Seth added to party Giostar Labs, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandeep Seth added to party Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA(pty:dft), Attorney Sandeep Seth added to party Scott Kirkpatrick(pty:dft), Attorney Sandeep Seth added to party Deven Patel(pty:dft), Attorney Sandeep Seth added to party Anand Srivastava(pty:dft)
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand [FIRST] against Siddharth Bhavsar, Giostar Labs, Inc., Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA, Scott Kirkpatrick, Deven Patel, Anand Srivastava, filed by Christina Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Christina Mendez regarding Venue, #2 Exhibit B - Fact Sheet Published by Bioscience Americas, #3 Exhibit C - January 26, 2019 Los Angeles Times Article) (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Mendez, as to Siddharth Bhavsar. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
July 10, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Mendez, as to Scott Kirkpatrick. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
July 10, 2020 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Mendez, as to Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Mendez, as to Giostar Labs, Inc.. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Mendez, as to Deven Patel. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christina Mendez, as to Anand Srivastava. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Mendez. Giostar Labs, Inc. served. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
June 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Mendez. Scott Kirkpatrick served. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
June 2, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Mendez. Deven Patel served. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Mendez. Bioscience Americas, LLC served. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Mendez. Anand Srivastava served. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Mendez. Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA served. (Spector, Naomi) (anh).
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA, Giostar Labs, Inc., Bioscience Americas, LLC, Anand Srivastava, Deven Patel, Siddharth Bhavsar, Scott Kirkpatrick, (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-13877693.), filed by Christina Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-915-CAB-BLM. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Spector, Naomi)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez v. Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kirkpatrick
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bioscience Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giostar Labs, Inc.
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anand Srivastava
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siddharth Bhavsar
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Institute Of Stem Cell Therapy And Research, USA
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deven Patel
Represented By: Sandeep Seth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Mendez
Represented By: Naomi B. Spector
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?