Starline Windows, Inc. v. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Plaintiff: Starline Windows, Inc.
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Case Number: 3:2020cv00916
Filed: May 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332jd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: (1) Converting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference to Video Conferences and (2) Issuing Updated Procedures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 7/2/2020.(jdt)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 7/29/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg. If the case does not settle during the ENE, the Court will conduct a Case Management Conference. The parties must file a Joint Discovery Plan no later than 7/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg on 6/26/2020. (jdt)
June 23, 2020 Filing 14 PRO HAC APPROVED: Thomas Daniel Heffernan appearing for Plaintiff Starline Windows, Inc., Counter Defendant Starline Windows, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14053351.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Heffernan, Thomas) (rmc).
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Other Affiliate AIG Property Casualty, Inc. for Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania.. (Drury, Michael) (jdt).
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 COUNTERCLAIM against Starline Windows, Inc., filed by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Drury, Michael) (jdt).
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania.(Drury, Michael) (jdt).
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Laurence R Phillips on behalf of Starline Windows, Inc. (Phillips, Laurence)Attorney Laurence R Phillips added to party Starline Windows, Inc.(pty:pla) (jdt).
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendant The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. No. #7 ). Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 6/23/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/8/2020. (jdt)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania. (Drury, Michael)Attorney Michael Drury added to party Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania(pty:dft) (jdt).
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Starline Windows, Inc. (Sham, Monica). QC email to have associated atty file NOA. (jdt).
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Starline Windows, Inc.. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania served. (Sham, Monica) (jdt).
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Starline Windows, Inc. (Sham, Monica). Modified on 5/19/2020 to add Corporate Parent - Martini Group Holdings Ltd. to Starline Windows, Inc. (jdt).
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Starline Windows, Inc. of case(s) D076653 . (Sham, Monica) (jdt).
May 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
May 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania (Filing fee $400.00 receipt number ACASDC-13877568.), filed by Starline Windows, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-916-LAB-MSB. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Sham, Monica)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starline Windows, Inc. v. Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Michael Drury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starline Windows, Inc.
Represented By: Monica Kim Sham
Represented By: Thomas Daniel Heffernan
Represented By: Laurence R Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?