Henry v. Atalla et al
Plaintiff: Mark Henry
Defendant: Patricia Atalla, Osama Atalla, Adel Atalla and Marialaina Tabak
Case Number: 3:2020cv00943
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Referring Judge: Nita L Stormes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint, by Adel Atalla, Osama Atalla, Patricia Atalla, Marialaina Tabak. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Vanderhoff, Alan)Attorney Alan Vanderhoff added to party Adel Atalla(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Vanderhoff added to party Osama Atalla(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Vanderhoff added to party Patricia Atalla(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Vanderhoff added to party Marialaina Tabak(pty:dft) (jmo).
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Henry. All Defendants served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service)(Kessler, Alexander) (jmo).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER (1) RECUSING FROM CASE and (2) REQUESTING REASSIGNMENT. Judge Janis L. Sammartino is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cynthia Bashant for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv0943-BAS-NLS. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/26/2020. (jdt)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Adel Atalla, Osama Atalla, Patricia Atalla, Marialaina Tabak ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13900987.), filed by Mark Henry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-943-JLS-NLS. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case. (Grant, Miles)(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Atalla et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Atalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Osama Atalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adel Atalla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marialaina Tabak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Henry
Represented By: Miles D Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?