Karen's Custom Grooming LLC v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Plaintiff: Karen's Custom Grooming LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Wells Fargo & Company and Wells Fargo Bank
Case Number: 3:2020cv00956
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint (Dkt. No. #9 ). Wells Fargo & Company answer due 8/4/2020; Wells Fargo Bank answer due 8/4/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/23/2020. (jdt)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer up to and including August 4, 2020 by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank. (Hogberg, Sverker) (jdt). Modified on 6/23/2020 to edit date in docket text (jdt).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants' deadline is extended to 6/25/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 6/17/2020. (jdt)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank . Identifying Other Affiliate Wells Fargo & Company for Wells Fargo Bank. (Hogberg, Sverker) (jdt).
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to and including 6/25/2020 by Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank. (Hogberg, Sverker)Attorney Sverker Kristoffer Hogberg added to party Wells Fargo & Company(pty:dft), Attorney Sverker Kristoffer Hogberg added to party Wells Fargo Bank(pty:dft) (jdt).
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen's Custom Grooming LLC. Wells Fargo Bank served. (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) (jdt).
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Karen's Custom Grooming LLC. Wells Fargo & Company served. (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) (jdt).
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Karen's Custom Grooming LLC . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Herkenhoff, Kathleen) (jdt).
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1-10, Wells Fargo & Company, Wells Fargo Bank ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13909179.), filed by Karen's Custom Grooming LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-956-LAB-BGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Herkenhoff, Kathleen)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karen's Custom Grooming LLC v. Wells Fargo & Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen's Custom Grooming LLC
Represented By: Kathleen A Herkenhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?