Case v. Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Case
Defendant: Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC and Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01049
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Isabelle L. Ord, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Request for Judicial Notice)(Ord, Isabelle) (tcf).
July 10, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC of case(s) 3:20-CV-01128-GPC-LL . (Katsell, Noah) (tcf).
July 8, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Isabelle Louise Ord on behalf of Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC (Ord, Isabelle)Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party Legoland California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Louise Ord added to party San Francisco Dungeon LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
July 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Hector Emilio Corea on behalf of Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC (Corea, Hector)Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party Legoland California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Hector Emilio Corea added to party San Francisco Dungeon LLC(pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: address needs to be updated in Pacer (tcf).
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Mutual on behalf of Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC (Mutual, Chelsea)Attorney Chelsea Mutual added to party Legoland California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Chelsea Mutual added to party Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Chelsea Mutual added to party Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Chelsea Mutual added to party Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Chelsea Mutual added to party Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Chelsea Mutual added to party San Francisco Dungeon LLC(pty:dft) (tcf).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #8 Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 8/5/2020. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/6/2020. (tcf)
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent Merlin Entertainments Group US, LLC for Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC; Corporate Parent Merlin Entertainments US Newco, LLC for Legoland California, LLC; Corporate Parent Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings, Inc. for Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC; Corporate Parent Legoland US Holdings Limited for Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.; Corporate Parent The Tussauds Group LLC for Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC. (Katsell, Noah) (tcf).
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff recuses from this case and directs the Clerk to randomly reassign this matter to another district judge. This case has been randomly reassigned to Judge John A. Houston for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this case. The new case number is 20-cv-1049-JAH-MSB. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/1/2020. (no document attached) (smy)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC. (Katsell, Noah)Attorney Noah A Katsell added to party Legoland California, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Noah A Katsell added to party Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Noah A Katsell added to party Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Noah A Katsell added to party Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Noah A Katsell added to party Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Noah A Katsell added to party San Francisco Dungeon LLC(pty:dft) (sxa).
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joyce Case. All Defendants served. (Marron, Ronald) (sxa).
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint,, Decl. under Cal. Civ. Code Sec. 1780(d) in Support of Complaint by Plaintiff Joyce Case. (Teel, Robert) (sxa).
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald Marron on behalf of Joyce Case (Marron, Ronald)Attorney Ronald Marron added to party Joyce Case (pty:pla) (sxa).
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Houchin on behalf of Joyce Case (Houchin, Michael)Attorney Michael Houchin added to party Joyce Case (pty:pla) (sxa).
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1049-H-MSB.(no document attached) (mme)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Legoland California, LLC, Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC, Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC, Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc., Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC, San Francisco Dungeon LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13980341.), filed by Joyce Case. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1049-BEN-MSB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Teel, Robert)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Case v. Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legoland California, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madame Tussauds Hollywood LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madame Tussauds San Francisco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin Entertainments Short Breaks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Francisco Dungeon LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin Entertainments Group U.S. Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Case
Represented By: Robert L. Teel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?