Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc. et al v. Haywood et al
Plaintiff: Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc. and Freshpoint Central California, Inc.
Defendant: Donald Breen, Joanne Ochsman, John W. Haywood, Erin Donofrio, Duncan Evans and Robert Allbritton
Case Number: 3:2020cv01065
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Breen to Respond to Complaint. Defendant Breen must respond to the Complaint on or before 8/25/2020. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 7/1/2020. (tcf)
July 1, 2020 Filing 20 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, or to Move or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Donald Breen. (Devlin, Tad) (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Robert Allbritton. (Devlin, Tad) Modified text to reflect document filed on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joanne Ochsman. (Devlin, Tad) Modified text to reflect document filed on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to John W. Haywood. (Devlin, Tad) Modified text to reflect document filed on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Duncan Evans. (Devlin, Tad) Modified text to reflect document filed on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Erin Donofrio. (Devlin, Tad) Modified text to reflect document filed on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. re #8 Request for Waiver of Service, filed by Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, #12 Request for Waiver of Service, filed by Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, #9 Request for Waiver of Service, filed by Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, #11 Request for Waiver of Service, filed by Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, #10 Request for Waiver of Service, filed by Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC . (Brown, Gregory) (tcf).
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Richard Perr, re #6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/26/2020.(rmc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Joanne Ochsman c/o her attorneys, Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP on June 26, 2020 by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc.. (Brown, Gregory) QC mailer re: attorney signature does not match CM/ECF account, document not executed (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John W. Haywood c/o his attorneys, Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP on June 26, 2020 by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. (Brown, Gregory) QC mailer re: attorney signature does not match CM/ECF account, document not executed (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Duncan Evans c/o his attorneys, Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP on June 26, 2020 by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. (Brown, Gregory) QC mailer re: attorney signature does not match CM/ECF account, document not executed (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Erin Donofrio c/o her attorneys, Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP on June 26, 2020 by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. (Brown, Gregory) QC mailer re: attorney signature does not match CM/ECF account, document not executed (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 ***Document withdrawn per ECF #14 *** REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert Allbritton c/o his attorneys, Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP on June 26, 2020 by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. (Brown, Gregory) QC mailer re: attorney signature does not match CM/ECF account, document not executed (tcf). Modified to withdraw document on 6/30/2020 (tcf).
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc. Donald Breen served. (Brown, Gregory) (tcf).
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14064042.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Attachments: #1 Certificant of Good Standing)(Perr, Richard) (rmc).
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 PRO HAC APPROVED: Gregory Adam Brown appearing for Plaintiffs Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14001002.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Brown, Gregory) (rmc).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Willie Itule Produce, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (vxc) (dsn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert Allbritton, Donald Breen, Erin Donofrio, Duncan Evans, John W. Haywood, Joanne Ochsman ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13997674.), filed by Freshpoint South Florida, Inc., Freshpoint Central California, Inc., Freshpoint Denver, Inc., Freshpoint Southern California, Inc., Willie Itule Produce, Inc., Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc., Premier Produce of South Florida LLC, Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1065-MMA-BGS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Kirby, Dean)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc. et al v. Haywood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Breen
Represented By: Tad Devlin
Represented By: Richard J. Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Ochsman
Represented By: Tad Devlin
Represented By: Richard J. Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Haywood
Represented By: Tad Devlin
Represented By: Richard J. Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Donofrio
Represented By: Tad Devlin
Represented By: Richard J. Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duncan Evans
Represented By: Tad Devlin
Represented By: Richard J. Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Allbritton
Represented By: Tad Devlin
Represented By: Richard J. Perr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshpoint South Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshpoint Atlanta, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshpoint Central Florida, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Premier Produce of South Florida LLC
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Itule Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshpoint Southern California, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshpoint Denver, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freshpoint Central California, Inc.
Represented By: Dean T Kirby, Jr
Represented By: Gregory Adam Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?