Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv01149
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:0101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 ex parte Motion to expedite Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/07/2020. (jpp)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Discovery For Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D Declarations in Support)(Bandlow, Lincoln) (jpp).
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln) (jpp).
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt).
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14055179.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Copyright Report)[Copyright Report Mailed]The new case number is 3:20-cv-1149-JLS-BLM. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Bandlow, Lincoln)(smd)(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D. Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?